This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2021 at 08:28:52 (UTC).

Gibbons v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Gibbons filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael F. Urbanski. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00395

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael F. Urbanski

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ana Gibbons

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo, PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo, PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly Guzzo, PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Road, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Defendant Attorneys

Esther Slater McDonald

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw, LLP

1075 Peachtree Street, N.E., Suite 2500

Atlanta, GA 30309

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

Po Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23218-1122

Gibson Sinclair Wright

Attorney at McCandlish Holton, PC

1111 East Main Street, Suite 2100

Richmond, VA 23218

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

#10

9 #1

Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order)

#9

#7

#6

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

#4

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

2 #2

Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC

2 #1

Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Oral ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint Trans Union, LLC answer due 9/16/2021. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/2/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Second Consent Motion by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Oral ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 9/17/2021. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/18/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Oral ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Trans Union, LLC answer due 9/2/2021. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/5/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 9/17/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/3/2021. (aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Wright, Gibson)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (McDonald, Esther)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDonald, Esther)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC)(aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402., Receipt# AVAWDC-3742212), filed by Ana Gibbons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Esther Slater McDonald