This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:41:43 (UTC).

Gibbons-Allen v. Hinson

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Gibbons-Allen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hinson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Norton and Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-03386

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David C Norton

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Claryce Gibbons-Allen

Defendant

Hazel L Hinson

Not Classified By Court

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Margie L Bright Matthews

Attorney at Margie Bright Matthews Law Office

Po Box 499

Walterboro, SC 29488

Gerald Malloy

Attorney at Malloy Law Firm

Po Box 1200

Hartsville, SC 29551

Not Classified By Court and Defendant Attorney

Phillip Florence, Jr

Attorney at The Florence Law Group LLC

3624 Locklear Lane

Mt Pleasant, SC 29466

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of Service

1 #3

Exhibit Acceptance of Service

1 #1

Exhibit Summons & Complaint

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hazel L Hinson, USAA General Indemnity Company.(jbry, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#11

(#11) First Rule 26(f) Report by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Florence, Phillip) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hazel L Hinson, USAA General Indemnity Company. (jbry, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/23/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/10/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/10/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/11/2020, Discovery due by 9/8/2020, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 9/21/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 11/1/2020, ADR Statement due by 10/1/2020, Mediation Due by 10/31/2020, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/6/2020. (jbry, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Jasper County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Clerk-Signed Acknowledgment)(Florence, Phillip) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-27-00602. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8807532), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company, Hazel L Hinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(jbry, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit Clerk-Signed Acknowledgment

#10

(#10) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Florence, Phillip) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First Rule 26(f) Report by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Florence, Phillip) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Florence, Phillip) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER to Case Number 9:19-cv-3386-BHH. Please use the new case number on all future filings. (vdru, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge Honorable David C Norton no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/23/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/10/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/10/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/11/2020, Discovery due by 9/8/2020, Motions in Limine due at least three weeks prior to jury selection, Motions due by 9/21/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 11/1/2020, ADR Statement due by 10/1/2020, Mediation Due by 10/31/2020, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/6/2020. (jbry, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Jasper County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Clerk-Signed Acknowledgment)(Florence, Phillip) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hazel L Hinson, USAA General Indemnity Company.(jbry, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hazel L Hinson, USAA General Indemnity Company. (jbry, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-27-00602. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8807532), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company, Hazel L Hinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(jbry, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.