This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 07:56:45 (UTC).

Giarratano v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Giarratano filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy B Vitter and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00088

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy B Vitter

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Giarratano

3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Defendants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association

The Travelers Indemnity Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Pennsylvania Insurance Company

Pennsylvania General Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendants

Eagle Inc.

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

ViacomCBS, Inc.

Hopeman Brothers Inc.

International Paper Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as insurer of Wayne Manufacturing Company, Inc.

General Electric Company

Zurich Insurance Company

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Uniroyal, Inc.

Foster Wheeler, LLC

The Manville Personal Injury Trust

ViacomCBS Inc

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

3Rd Party Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Connor Peth

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Daphne M. Lancaster

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Scott Minyard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Kevin Powell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Timothy Farrow Daniels

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Laura Ashleigh Leggette

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephanie B. Laborde

Attorney at Lafleur & Laborde, LLC

6160 Perkins Road, Suite 225

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Benjamin M. Chapman

Attorney at Lafleur & Laborde, LLC

6160 Perkins Road, Suite 225

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Other Attorneys

Gerolyn Petit Roussel

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Benjamin Peter Dinehart

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Jonathan Brett Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Lauren Roussel Clement

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.

Attorney at Roussel & Clement

1550 West Causeway Approach

Mandeville, LA 70471

Kristopher T. Wilson

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard (New Orleans)

60L Poydras St., Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

James R. Guidry

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin, & Hubbard

601 Poydras Street, Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Katherine Osborne Hannan

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard (New Orleans)

60L Poydras St., Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Patricia Cowen Penton

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard (New Orleans)

60L Poydras St., Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward T. Hayes

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#25

(#25) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent - Zurich Holding Company Company of America, Inc.; Corporate Parent - Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd; Corporate Parent - Zurich Insurance Group Ltd to Zurich American Insurance Company. (Devenport, Marc) Modified text/corporate parents on 2/23/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to #2 Third Party Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Marc E. Devenport added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:3pd).(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 2/23/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#23

(#23) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to #2 , Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company. Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:3pd).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 2/18/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#21

(#21) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #2 Third Party Complaint by Uniroyal, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 2/18/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#12

(#19) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Answer to Third Party Complaint. **Filing attorney uploaded document on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (jeg) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

4 #10

Summons

4 #8

Summons

4 #7

Summons

4 #6

Summons

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

#2

(#20) ANSWER to #2 Third Party Complaint by Uniroyal, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 2/18/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/17/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages by Travelers Indemnity Company.Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 2/8/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Zurich Holding Company Company of America, Inc.,Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd, and Zurich Insurance Group Ltd as as a corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary. Please ensure that all corporate parents are entered when prompted on future pleadings.** (jeg) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent - Zurich Holding Company Company of America, Inc.; Corporate Parent - Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd; Corporate Parent - Zurich Insurance Group Ltd to Zurich American Insurance Company. (Devenport, Marc) Modified text/corporate parents on 2/23/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #2 Third Party Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Marc E. Devenport added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:3pd).(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 2/23/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #2 , Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company. Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:3pd).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 2/18/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #2 Third Party Complaint by Uniroyal, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 2/18/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Answer to Third Party Complaint. **Filing attorney uploaded document on incorrect sized paper. Local Rule 10.1E states 'All papers drafted for filing in this court shall be on 8-1/2 by 11 inch paper. Clerk has reduced images. No further action needed.** (jeg) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Eagle Inc. (Kinler, Douglas) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages by Travelers Indemnity Company.Attorney Kristopher T. Wilson added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 2/8/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephanie Bienvenu Laborde on behalf of Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. (Laborde, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kelly P. Giarratano (Dinehart, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Third Party Complaint Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., Eagle Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc, International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Manville Personal Injury Trust, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc., ViacomCBS Inc, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(jeg) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **1.Filing attorney uploaded main document with incorrect case caption. Corrected document subsequently provided to Clerk, and Image has been replaced. 2.Document lists counsel Scott Minyard for a party in this action who have not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this court's Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Any future filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted and will be deemed deficient.** (jeg) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer CropScience, Inc., Eagle Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers Inc., International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Manville Personal Injury Trust, Uniroyal, Inc., ViacomCBS, Inc., Zurich Insurance Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Third Party Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 1/20/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (sek) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Eagle Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., ViacomCBS, Inc., Hopeman Brothers Inc., International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, General Electric Company, Zurich Insurance Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Uniroyal, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, Manville Personal Injury Trust by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified text on 1/19/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, 21-10019 Div E Sec 7 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9185086) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/19/2022) (jeg). Modified text on 1/19/2022 (jeg). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association is a litigant

Latest cases where ZURICH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust is a litigant