This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:00:57 (UTC).

Gholston v. Franklin County Board of Education et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Gholston filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Franklin County Board of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is C Lynwood Smith, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

C Lynwood Smith, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandi Gholston

Defendants

Greg Hamilton

Gary Odom

Franklin County Board of Education

Darit Riddle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henry F Sherrod, III

Attorney at HENRY F SHERROD III PC

119 South Court Street

Florence, AL 35630

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel P Ogle

Attorney at Boardman, Carr, Petelos, Watkins & Ogle, P.C.

400 Boardman Drive

Chelsea, AL 35043-8211

Mark S Boardman

Attorney at BOARDMAN, CARR, PETELOS, WATKINS & OGLE, P.C.

400 Boardman Drive

Chelsea, AL 35043-8211

Carl E Johnson, Jr

Attorney at BISHOP COLVIN JOHNSON & KENT LLP

1910 First Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Greg Hamilton served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Ogle on behalf of Gary Odom (Ogle, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Darit Riddle served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Gary Odom served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Greg Hamilton, Darit Riddle. RTS - No Mail Receptacle Unable to Forward(AHI) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed Franklin County Board of Education served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Franklin County Board of Education. RTS No Mail Receptacle Unable to forward (AHI) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Franklin County Board of Education.(Johnson, Carl) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Franklin County Board of Education, Greg Hamilton, Gary Odom, and Darit Riddle by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Brandi Gholston. (AHI) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gary Odom.(Boardman, Mark) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Greg Hamilton, Darit Riddle.(Ogle, Daniel) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

#7

(#7) Alias Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Franklin County Board of Education, Greg Hamilton, and Darit Riddle. (AHI) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Brandi Gholston.(AHI) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Franklin County Board of Education.(Johnson, Carl) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Greg Hamilton, Darit Riddle.(Ogle, Daniel) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P Ogle on behalf of Gary Odom (Ogle, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed Franklin County Board of Education served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gary Odom.(Boardman, Mark) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Darit Riddle served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed Greg Hamilton served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Alias Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Franklin County Board of Education, Greg Hamilton, and Darit Riddle. (AHI) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Gary Odom served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (AHI) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Greg Hamilton, Darit Riddle. RTS - No Mail Receptacle Unable to Forward(AHI) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Franklin County Board of Education. RTS No Mail Receptacle Unable to forward (AHI) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Franklin County Board of Education, Greg Hamilton, Gary Odom, and Darit Riddle by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3507503 (receipt number B4601103110). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Brandi Gholston.(AHI). (Sherrod, Henry) Modified on 1/7/2020 (BJL). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Brandi Gholston. (AHI) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Brandi Gholston.(AHI) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.