This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:52:06 (UTC).

Ghoston v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Ghoston filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra M. Brown and David A. Sanders. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00173

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Natarsha Gholston

Natarsha Ghoston

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Frederick Ketcherside

Attorney at JOHN F. KETCHERSIDE

Po Box 70

Denmark, TN 38391

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/27/2019. (def)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/13/2019. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Reissued as to Commissioner of Social Security (for service upon Commissioner); forwarded to US Marshal for service. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; forwarded to US Marshal for service (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/27/2019. (def)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Natarsha Ghoston. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT,, filed by Natarsha Ghoston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.