This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2023 at 08:23:42 (UTC).

Ghazaryan v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 Ghazaryan filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PHH Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathaniel M. Gorton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-10120

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathaniel M. Gorton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seda H. Ghazaryan

Defendants

PHH Mortgage Corporation

HSBC Bank USA, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd S. Dion

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin W. Manganaro

Maura K. McKelvey

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHH Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Bank USA, Nat'l Ass'n ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9674005 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Corporate Summary, #3 Exhibit C - Suffolk Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Corporate Summary

1 #3

Exhibit C - Suffolk Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Category Form

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Manganaro on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Manganaro, Kevin). (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Maura K. McKelvey on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation (McKelvey, Maura). (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 15, 2023 to to Respond to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#8

(#8) STATE COURT Record. (Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 22, 2023 to Respond to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

#11

(#11) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 4/11/2023 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference, to be held by telephone, set for 4/11/2023 03:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Lima, Christine) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 22, 2023 to Respond to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 22, 2023 to Respond to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT Record. (Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 15, 2023 to Respond to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Warnock, Douglas) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 15, 2023 to to Respond to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation.(Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket(#5) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Maura K. McKelvey on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation (McKelvey, Maura). (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Manganaro on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Manganaro, Kevin). (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PHH Mortgage Corporation, HSBC Bank USA, Nat'l Ass'n ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9674005 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Corporate Summary, #3 Exhibit C - Suffolk Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Manganaro, Kevin) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less