This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2020 at 07:02:26 (UTC).

Ghazarian v. Swissport USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Ghazarian filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Swissport USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06994

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patreek Ghazarian

Defendant

Swissport USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott A. Kennedy

Attorney at Law Offices of Burg & Brock

4554 Sherman Oaks Avenue

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie B. Gonzalez

Attorney at Fitzpatrick and Hunt, Pagano, Aubert, LLP

633 West Fifth Street, 60Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Garth W. Aubert

Attorney at Fitzpatrick & Hunt, Pagano, Aubert, LLP

633 West Fifth Street, 60Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco Before Judge James Donato. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/4/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Swissport USA, Inc... (Gonzalez, Stephanie) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Swissport USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Swissport Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Aviation Liability Insurer for Swissport USA, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Swissport USA, Inc. . (Gonzalez, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/8/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

1 #6

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #5

Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-583852. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15036429). Filed bySwissport USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gonzalez, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/7/2020) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco Before Judge James Donato. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/4/2021. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Swissport USA, Inc... (Gonzalez, Stephanie) (Filed on 12/2/2020) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Swissport USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Swissport Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Aviation Liability Insurer for Swissport USA, Inc.. (Gonzalez, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities filed by Swissport USA, Inc. Filer did not add all interested parties to E CF. Re-file this document and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Swissport USA, Inc. . (Gonzalez, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/8/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20) re #1 . #4 Notice of Removal, filed by Swissport USA, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-583852. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15036429). Filed bySwissport USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gonzalez, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/7/2020) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less