This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2022 at 08:27:00 (UTC).

Ghag v. Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 Ghag filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry M Herlong, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-03558

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry M Herlong, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paven K Ghag

Defendant

Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa Leila Louzri

Defendant Attorney

James Derrick Quattlebaum

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-1074858.), filed by Paven K Ghag. Service due by 1/12/2023.(arut) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Paven K Ghag.(arut) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan. (arut) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Green card

#6

(#6) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan answer due 11/30/2022. (Quattlebaum, James) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/4/2022 with corrected document provided by filing user) (arut). (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#9

(#9) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Joint Stipulation Deadline 2/23/2023. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/30/22. (arut) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due prior to 2/13/2023. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/30/22. (arut) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due prior to 2/13/2023. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/30/22. (arut) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Joint Stipulation Deadline 2/23/2023. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/30/22. (arut) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan.(Quattlebaum, James) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan answer due 11/30/2022. (Quattlebaum, James) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/4/2022 with corrected document provided by filing user) (arut). (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paven K Ghag. Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan served on 10/18/2022, answer due 11/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Green card)(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan. (arut) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Paven K Ghag.(arut) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America Short Term Disability Plan ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-1074858.), filed by Paven K Ghag. Service due by 1/12/2023.(arut) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less