This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2020 at 09:12:16 (UTC).

Getahun v. Kohli Enterprises LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Getahun filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Kohli Enterprises LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00664

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gashu Getahun

Defendants

Asseem Kohli

Ritu Kohli

Kohli Enterprises LLC

Kohli Ventures LLC

Aseem Kohli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Leonard Scalise

Attorney at Ross & Scalise, P.C.

1104 San Antonio Street

Austin, TX 78701

Steven Robert Samples

Attorney at Samples Ames PLLC

2727 Lbj Freeway, Suite 922

Dallas, TX 75234

Daniel Bret Ross

Attorney at Ross Scalise Law Group

1104 San Antonio Street

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Mark A Shoffner

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

2323 Ross Avenue, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

Parker A Burns

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

2323 Ross Avenue, Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL: Having considered the Motion, pleadings, and the relevant law, the Court GRANTS the Motion and EXTENDS Defendants' deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial to 5/29/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/7/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Second) filed by Aseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shoffner, Mark) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC. Responsive pleading due by 5/8/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/9/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burns, Parker) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Parker A Burns for Mark A. Shoffner on behalf of Aseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC. (Burns, Parker) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Asseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC. (hml) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gashu Getahun. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Gashu Getahun. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10709557) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL: Having considered the Motion, pleadings, and the relevant law, the Court GRANTS the Motion and EXTENDS Defendants' deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial to 5/29/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/7/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Second) filed by Aseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shoffner, Mark) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC. Responsive pleading due by 5/8/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/9/2020) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Aseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burns, Parker) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Parker A Burns for Mark A. Shoffner on behalf of Aseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC. (Burns, Parker) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Asseem Kohli, Ritu Kohli, Kohli Enterprises LLC, Kohli Ventures LLC. (hml) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gashu Getahun. (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Gashu Getahun. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10709557) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scalise, Charles) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Robert Samples

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel B. Ross

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles L. Scalise