This case was last updated from PACER on 11/02/2021 at 07:14:05 (UTC).

Gesualdi et al v. Carpet Transport Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 Gesualdi filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Carpet Transport Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joanna Seybert and A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04977

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joanna Seybert

Referral Judge

A. Kathleen Tomlinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas Gesualdi

Louis Bisignano

Darin Jeffers

Michael O' Toole

Michael Bourgal

Frank H. Finkel

Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.

Marc Herbst

Thomas Corbett

Robert G. Wessels

Defendants

Carpet Transport Inc.

Consolidated Carpet Associates, Limited Liability Company

CCTW Holdings Inc.

Consolidated Carpet

Carpet Transport

Consolidated Carpet Associates, LLC

CCTW Holding Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher A. Smith

Attorney at Trivella & Forte, LLP

1311 Mamaroneck Avenue, Suite 170

White Plains, NY 10605

Defendant Attorney

Richard B. Ziskin

Attorney at The Ziskin Law Firm, LLP

6268 Jericho Turnpike, Suite 12A

Commack, NY 11725

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Ziskin on behalf of CCTW Holdings Inc., Consolidated Carpet Associates, Limited Liability Company (aty to be noticed) (Ziskin, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Discovery/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER, Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/23/2021. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Order Confidentiality Stipulation

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against CCTW Holdings Inc., Carpet Transport Inc., Consolidated Carpet Associates, Limited Liability Company, filed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Thomas Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O' Toole, Robert G. Wessels, Michael Bourgal. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Ziskin on behalf of Carpet Transport Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Ziskin, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Thomas Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O' Toole, Robert G. Wessels, Michael Bourgal. CCTW Holdings Inc. waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Thomas Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O' Toole, Robert G. Wessels, Michael Bourgal. Consolidated Carpet Associates, Limited Liability Company waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

4 #3

Summons #4

4 #2

Summons #3

4 #1

Summons #2

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

2 #1

Additional Corrections

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Ziskin on behalf of CCTW Holdings Inc., Consolidated Carpet Associates, Limited Liability Company (aty to be noticed) (Ziskin, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Discovery/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER, Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 9/23/2021. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent MOTION for Discovery Order by Carpet Transport Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Confidentiality Stipulation) (Ziskin, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against CCTW Holdings Inc., Carpet Transport Inc., Consolidated Carpet Associates, Limited Liability Company, filed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Thomas Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O' Toole, Robert G. Wessels, Michael Bourgal. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Ziskin on behalf of Carpet Transport Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Ziskin, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Thomas Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O' Toole, Robert G. Wessels, Michael Bourgal. CCTW Holdings Inc. waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Thomas Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O' Toole, Robert G. Wessels, Michael Bourgal. Consolidated Carpet Associates, Limited Liability Company waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Thomas Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O' Toole, Robert G. Wessels, Michael Bourgal. Carpet Transport Inc. waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Smith, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2, #2 Summons #3, #3 Summons #4) (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2021: #1 Additional Corrections) (Landow, Concetta). (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CCTW Holdings Inc., Carpet Transport Inc., Consolidated Carpet Associates, Limited Liability Company , LLC filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14809890 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Thomas Corbett, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O' Toole, Robert G. Wessels, Michael Bourgal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons) (Smith, Christopher) Modified on 9/7/2021 (Landow, Concetta). (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A. Smith