This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2021 at 07:12:40 (UTC).

AROCHO v. STELLAR GROUP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 AROCHO filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against STELLAR GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY R. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01191

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY R. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AROCHO GERONIMO

GERONIMO AROCHO

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

MULTIVAC, INC.

STELLAR GROUP

D&F EQUIPMENT SALES, INC.

TAVIL IND. S.A.U.

LAFFERTY EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURING, INC.

JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION doing business as JBT FOODTECH doing business as JBT AUTOMATED SYSTEMS

STELLAR GROUP, INC. doing business as THE STELLAR GROUP

STELLAR GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREW ROSS BENN

Attorney at BENN LAW LLC

1617 John F Kennedy Blvd Ste 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

JONATHAN WOY

Attorney at Gibbons P.C.

One Logan Square, 130 N. 18Th Street, Suite 1210

Philadelphia, PA 19103

PATRICK J. HASSON

Attorney at STYLIADES, MEZZANOTTE& HASSON

520 Walnut Street, Suite 1610

Philadelphia, PA 19106

JOHN J. SNYDER

Attorney at RAWLE & HENDERSON, LLP.

The Widener Bldg., 16H Floor, One South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

WILLIAM J. CARR, JR.

Attorney at RAWLE & HENDERSON LLP

One South Penn Square, The Widener Building

Philadelphia, PA 19107

JOSEPH A. GORMAN

Attorney at RAWLE & HENDERSON LLP

One South Penn Square, The Widener Building

Philadelphia, PA 19107

TIMOTHY JAMES KEPNER

Attorney at WILLIAM J. FERREN & ASSOCIATES

1500 Market St Ste 2920

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JENNIFER E. WATSON

Attorney at WILBRAHAM LAWLER & BUBA PC

603 Stanwix St., Two Gateway Ctr #17 North

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-1425

EDWARD J. MCGINN, JR.

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

620 Freedom Business Center, Suite 300

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

 

Court Documents

#33

32 #1

Certificate of Service Cert of Service

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

26 #1

Appendix Verification

5 #3

Certificate of Service CERT OF SERVICE

5 #2

Exhibit FEDEX PROOF OF DELIVERY

5 #1

Exhibit COVER LTR ENC COMPLAINT

#5

3 #1

Certificate of Service regarding Notice of Appearance

#3

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) CONSENT AND ORDER TO JURISDICTION BY US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THAT CASE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R RICE TO CONDUCT ALL PROCEEDINGS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/6/21. 5/7/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by TAVIL IND. S.A.U... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(CARR, WILLIAM) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by D&F EQUIPMENT SALES, INC. (HASSON, PATRICK) Modified on 5/3/2021 (rt). (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/8/2021 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND. MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 8/23/2021. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 6/25/2021. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/23/2021. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/23/2021. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 9/14/2021 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/29/2021. 4/29/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to Complaint certificate of service, CROSSCLAIM against all defendants / against D&F EQUIPMENT SALES, INC., LAFFERTY EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURING, INC., MULTIVAC, INC., STELLAR GROUP, INC., TAVIL IND. S.A.U. by JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(WATSON, JENNIFER) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION.(WATSON, JENNIFER) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER E. WATSON on behalf of JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION with Jury Demand, Certificate of Service(WATSON, JENNIFER) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, LAFFERTY EQUIPMENT MANUFACTURING, INC., MULTIVAC, INC., TAVIL IND. S.A.U. by STELLAR GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Verification)(MCGINN, EDWARD) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DF Tavil Ind, S.A.U. ANSWER to Complaint together with of DF Tavil to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Crossclaims , CROSSCLAIM against TAVIL IND. S.A.U. by TAVIL IND. S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service cert of service)(CARR, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Xerbanda XXI SL with Certificate of Service by TAVIL IND. S.A.U.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service cert of service)(CARR, WILLIAM) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED BY AND BETWEEN THE UNDERSIGNED COUNSEL THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANT MULTIVAC, INC. TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO APRIL 28, 2021. NO SUCH PRIOR EXTENSION HAS BEEN REQUESTED OR GRANTED.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 4/15/2021. 4/15/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by MULTIVAC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WOY, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served COMPLAINT upon JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION by CERTIFIED MAIL on 04/06/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROOF OF SERVICE, #2 Certificate of Service CERT OF SERVICE)(BENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served COMPLAINT upon D&F EQUIPMENT SALES, INC. by CERTIFIED MAIL on 03/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PROOF OF SERVICE, #2 Certificate of Service CERT OF SERVICE)(BENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served COMPLAINT upon STELLAR GROUP by CERTIFIED MAIL on 03/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by FEDEX INTERNATIONAL PRIORITY re: served COMPLAINT upon TAVIL IND. S.A.U. by MAIL - FEDEX INTERNATIONAL PRIORITY on 03/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COVER LTR ENC COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit FEDEX PROOF OF DELIVERY, #3 Certificate of Service CERT OF SERVICE)(BENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (fdc, ) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN WOY on behalf of MULTIVAC, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service regarding Notice of Appearance)(WOY, JONATHAN) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/15/2021. 3/15/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MULTIVAC, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14978240), filed by MULTIVAC, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(WOY, JONATHAN) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELLAR GROUP PTY LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHN BEAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION is a litigant