This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 11:21:13 (UTC).

Germany v. Hutchinson et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Germany filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hutchinson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John C. Gargiulo, David C. Bramlette, III and Carlton W. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00426

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John C. Gargiulo

Presiding Judges

David C. Bramlette, III

Carlton W. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan D. Germany

Defendants

Roy L. Irons

T. Delton Moore

Steven M. Porter

Ken Walley

Chris L. Hutchinson

Robert M. Harkins

Robert L. Smith, Jr.

Mark D. Williams

Frank L. Conaway, Jr.

Laura C. Richoux

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Edward Rainer

Attorney at RAINER LAW FIRM, PLLC

P. O. Box 258

Brandon, MS 39043

Defendant Attorney

Justin L. Matheny-State Gov

Attorney at MISSISSIPPI ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

P. O. Box 220, 550 High Street (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0220

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Exhibit A - Chris Hutchinson Declaration

#6

(#6) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Frank L. Conaway, Jr, Robert M. Harkins, Chris L. Hutchinson, Roy L. Irons, T. Delton Moore, Steven M. Porter, Laura C. Richoux, Robert L. Smith, Jr, Ken Walley, Mark D. Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chris Hutchinson Declaration)(Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Frank L. Conaway, Jr, Robert M. Harkins, Chris L. Hutchinson, Roy L. Irons, T. Delton Moore, Steven M. Porter, Laura C. Richoux, Robert L. Smith, Jr, Ken Walley, Mark D. Williams.(Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Carlton W. Reeves for all further proceedings. District Judge David C. Bramlette, III no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 7/1/20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MGB) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Frank L. Conaway, Jr, Robert M. Harkins, Chris L. Hutchinson, Roy L. Irons, T. Delton Moore, Steven M. Porter, Laura C. Richoux, Robert L. Smith, Jr, Ken Walley, Mark D. Williams. (PKM) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F - License Verification of Kenneth Walley

1 #5

Exhibit E - Email from Ken Walley

1 #4

Exhibit D - Information re: Certification of Dental Specialists

1 #3

Exhibit C - 2017 Decision from 5th Circuit

1 #2

Exhibit B - 2017 Report from State Auditor

1 #1

Exhibit A - Board Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE of CANCELLED Calendar Setting: Pursuant to the Text Only Order Staying Proceedings, the Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2020 before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo is hereby CANCELLED. (AB) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS. Defendants' #6 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings raises the issue of immunity. Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 16(b)(3)(B), proceedings in this matter, including discovery, are stayed pending ruling on the Motion. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 8/11/2020 (AG) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Frank L. Conaway, Jr, Robert M. Harkins, Chris L. Hutchinson, Roy L. Irons, T. Delton Moore, Steven M. Porter, Laura C. Richoux, Robert L. Smith, Jr, Ken Walley, Mark D. Williams (Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Frank L. Conaway, Jr, Robert M. Harkins, Chris L. Hutchinson, Roy L. Irons, T. Delton Moore, Steven M. Porter, Laura C. Richoux, Robert L. Smith, Jr, Ken Walley, Mark D. Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chris Hutchinson Declaration)(Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. (AB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Frank L. Conaway, Jr, Robert M. Harkins, Chris L. Hutchinson, Roy L. Irons, T. Delton Moore, Steven M. Porter, Laura C. Richoux, Robert L. Smith, Jr, Ken Walley, Mark D. Williams.(Matheny-State Gov, Justin) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Carlton W. Reeves for all further proceedings. District Judge David C. Bramlette, III no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 7/1/20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MGB) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Frank L. Conaway, Jr, Robert M. Harkins, Chris L. Hutchinson, Roy L. Irons, T. Delton Moore, Steven M. Porter, Laura C. Richoux, Robert L. Smith, Jr, Ken Walley, Mark D. Williams. (PKM) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, TRO, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF against Frank L. Conaway, Jr, Robert M. Harkins, Chris L. Hutchinson, Roy L. Irons, T. Delton Moore, Steven M. Porter, Laura C. Richoux, Robert L. Smith, Jr, Ken Walley, Mark D. Williams ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0528-430-6917), filed by Jonathan D. Germany. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Board Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - 2017 Report from State Auditor, #3 Exhibit C - 2017 Decision from 5th Circuit, #4 Exhibit D - Information re: Certification of Dental Specialists, #5 Exhibit E - Email from Ken Walley, #6 Exhibit F - License Verification of Kenneth Walley, #7 Exhibit G - Kenneth Walley Website, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(PKM) Modified on 6/26/2020 (PKM). (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less