This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 07:58:02 (UTC).

Germantown Mutual Insurance Company v. Home Depot USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Germantown Mutual Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Home Depot USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00615

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Germantown Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

Home Depot USA, Inc.

Midea America Corporation

Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hillary Annin Nester

Attorney at Ron Harmeyer Law Office, LLC

330 East Kilbourn Ave, Suite 1070

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Ronald W. Harmeyer

Attorney at Ron Harmeyer Law Office, LLC

330 East Kilbourn Ave, Suite 1070

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant Attorneys

Katelyn Evalise Paider

Attorney at Falk Legal Group

1037 N Astor St.

Milwaukee, WI 53202

John J. Reid

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

330 East Kilbourne Avenue, Suite 575

Milwaukee, WI 53202

R Fletcher Koch

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

330 East Kilbourne Avenue, Suite 575

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Motion to Transfer

1 #2

Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Nester, Hillary) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Paider, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Paider, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by John J. Reid for Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#6

(#6) Motion to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 10/19/2021. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by R Fletcher Koch for Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Koch, R) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#8

(#8) Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by John J. Reid for Defendant Midea America Corporation. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#11

(#11) Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant Midea America Corporation (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#12

(#12) ANSWER by Defendant Midea America Corporation. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance filed by R Fletcher Koch for Defendant Midea America Corporation. (Koch, R) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party (Nester, Hillary) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (rks) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The parties have filed a document they call a "stipulation for dismissal of party," in which they agree to dismiss Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company. Dkt. #14 . But plaintiff is still proceeding on claims against other defendants. When a plaintiff wishes to dismiss less than the entire action, the proper course is to file an amended pleading under Rule 15(a) rather than a stipulation of dismissal. See Taylor v. Brown, 787 F. 3d 851, 857-58 (7th Cir. 2015). I construe the parties' stipulation as a motion for leave to amend the complaint, and so construed, the motion is GRANTED. Allianz Global is DISMISSED. Plaintiff need not file a new complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/8/2021. (rks) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party (Nester, Hillary) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance filed by R Fletcher Koch for Defendant Midea America Corporation. (Koch, R) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER by Defendant Midea America Corporation. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant Midea America Corporation (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by John J. Reid for Defendant Midea America Corporation. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Katelyn E. Paider withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/12/2021. (jls) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by R Fletcher Koch for Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Koch, R) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to Substitute Attorney by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 10/19/2021. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by John J. Reid for Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. (Reid, John) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Paider, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.. (Paider, Katelyn) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Nester, Hillary) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case transferred in from the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Case Number 2:21-cv-1120. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Transfer, #2 Docket Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where MIDEA AMERICA CORPS. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John J. Reid