This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2020 at 07:42:13 (UTC).

Germano v. Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Germano filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-06733

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Germano

Defendants

Brett K. Haumann

Greg Behar

Mark D. McDade

Patrick G. Enright

Jayson D.A. Dallas

Stacey D. Seltzer

Kathryn E. Falberg

Mark T. Iwicki

Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Eldridge Bower

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#8

#7

6 #8

Summons Summons Stacey Seltzer

6 #7

Summons Summons Patrick Enright

6 #6

Summons Summons Mark McDade

6 #5

Summons Summons Mark Iwicki

6 #4

Summons Summons Kathryn Falberg

6 #3

Summons Summons Jayson Dallas

6 #2

Summons Summons Greg Behar

6 #1

Summons Summons Bret Haumann

#6

5 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#5

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet

1 #1

Declaration PSLRA Certification

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 9 Clerk's Notice,, #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Proposed Order filed by Steven Germano. (Bower, David) (Filed on 11/18/2020) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Class Complaint and CMC order served on Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc. on 10/21/2020, filed by Steven Germano. (Bower, David) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE RE-SETTING DATE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2020 is CONTINUED to MONDAY, 1/11/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom Webinar Videoconference before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. Zoom link information is also on the Judge's page on the court website www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/gonzalez-rogers-yvonne-ygr/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Aimmune Therapeutics, Inc., Greg Behar, Jayson D.A. Dallas, Patrick G. Enright, Kathryn E. Falberg, Brett K. Haumann, Mark T. Iwicki, Mark D. McDade, Stacey D. Seltzer. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. (Bower, David) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Only ONE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: #6 Proposed Summons, filed by Steven German o (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Bret Haumann, #2 Summons Summons Greg Behar, #3 Summons Summons Jayson Dallas, #4 Summons Summons Kathryn Falberg, #5 Summons Summons Mark Iwicki, #6 Summons Summons Mark McDade, #7 Summons Summons Patrick Enright, #8 Summons Summons Stacey Seltzer)(Bower, David) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020) (Entered: 09/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#3) Docketed in Error. Please Disregard. See Docket Entry 4 Case assigned Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified on 9/26/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven Germano re #1 Complaint, (Bower, David) (Filed on 9/25/2020) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14990444.). Filed bySteven Germano. (Attachments: #1 Declaration PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet)(Bower, David) (Filed on 9/25/2020) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less