This case was last updated from PACER on 06/11/2021 at 16:17:33 (UTC).

Gerbert v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Gerbert filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Molly H Cherry and Margaret B Seymour. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-01061

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Molly H Cherry

Presiding Judge

Margaret B Seymour

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tammy Sue Gerbert

Defendant

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Interested Parties

Social Security Administrative Record

US Attorney - Social Security Noticing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Thomas Milton

Attorney at Beatrice E Whitten Law Office

1110 Queensborough Boulevard

Mt Pleasant, SC 29464

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H. Cherry on 4/13/2021.(tsim, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Tammy Sue Gerbert. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 5/17/2021, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Whitten, Beatrice) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Molly H. Cherry on 4/13/2021.(tsim, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 7/12/2021. (tsim, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Tammy Sue Gerbert. Response to Motion due by 4/26/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Fee Agreement). No proposed order. Motions referred to Molly H. Cherry. (tsim, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website. Filed by Tammy Sue Gerbert. Service due by 7/12/2021. (tsim, ) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Noticing is a litigant

Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Thomas Milton