This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2020 at 09:31:25 (UTC).

Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc. et al v. Gwinnett County Board of Registration and Elections et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Gwinnett County Board of Registration and Elections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William M. Ray, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01587

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc.

Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc.

Common Cause

New Georgia Project

Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc.

Limary Ruiz Torres

Albert Mendez

Defendants

Ben Satterfield

John Mangano

Brad Raffensperger

Beauty Baldwin

Alice O'Lenick

Stephen Day

Gwinnett County Board of Registration and Elections

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Julie Marie Houk

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Suite 900, 1500 K. Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

John Michael Powers

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Suite 900, 1500 K. Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Bryan Ludington Sells

Attorney at The Law Office of Bryan L. Sells, LLC

P.O. Box 5493, 1226 Springdale Road, Ne

Atlanta, GA 31107-0493

Ezra David Rosenberg

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Suite 900, 1500 K. Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan Francis Jacoutot

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Bryan P. Tyson

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Diane Festin LaRoss

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Loree Anne Paradise

Attorney at Taylor English Duma LLP

Suite 200, 1600 Parkwood Circle

Atlanta, GA 30339

Miles Christian Skedsvold

Attorney at Georgia Attorney General's Office

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Elizabeth T. Young

Attorney at Attorney General's Office-Atl

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

35 #3

Text of Proposed Order

35 #2

Exhibit B - redline showing changes from first to second amended complaint

35 #1

Exhibit A - proposed second amended complaint

#35

#34

30 #4

Exhibit 4: Alvarez supp. decl.

#13

2 #6

Summons Raffensperger

2 #5

Summons O'Lenick

2 #4

Summons Baldwin

2 #3

Summons Satterfield

2 #2

Summons Day

2 #1

Summons Mangano

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Withdrawal of Motion #35 MOTION to Amend #13 Amended Complaint,, filed by New Georgia Project, Albert Mendez, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Limary Ruiz Torres, Common Cause, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc. filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Albert Mendez, New Georgia Project, Limary Ruiz Torres. (Powers, John) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, Gwinnett County Board of Registration and Elections, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Brad Raffensperger, Ben Satterfield filed by Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Albert Mendez, New Georgia Project, Limary Ruiz Torres.(Powers, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION to Amend #13 Amended Complaint,, with Brief In Support by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Albert Mendez, New Georgia Project, Limary Ruiz Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed second amended complaint, #2 Exhibit B - redline showing changes from first to second amended complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #31 MOTION to Strike #30 Reply Brief, Declarations and MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER denying #17 Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court finds that Plaintiffs are not likely to succeed on the merits of their claims, and, therefore, are not entitled to a temporary restraining order or a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/8/2020. (ah) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE re #31 MOTION to Strike #30 Reply Brief,, Declarations MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Albert Mendez, New Georgia Project, Limary Ruiz Torres. (Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to Strike #30 Reply Brief,, Declarations, MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief with Brief In Support by Brad Raffensperger. (Young, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY BRIEF re #17 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Albert Mendez, New Georgia Project, Limary Ruiz Torres. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: McDonald decl., #2 Exhibit 2: Butler supp. decl., #3 Exhibit 3: Romero supp. decl., #4 Exhibit 4: Alvarez supp. decl., #5 Exhibit 5: Powers supp. decl.)(Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, Gwinnett County Board of Registration and Elections, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Paradise, Loree Anne) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION for Admission of Julie Houk Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9594781).by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., New Georgia Project. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Beauty Baldwin, Stephen Day, Gwinnett County Board of Registration and Elections, John Mangano, Alice O'Lenick, Ben Satterfield (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of John Powers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9594387).by Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., New Georgia Project. (Sells, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., Common Cause, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., New Georgia Project. Beauty Baldwin waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Stephen Day waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Gwinnett County Board of Registration and Elections waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; John Mangano waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Alice O'Lenick waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Ben Satterfield waiver mailed on 4/14/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service by John Mangano, #2 Waiver of Service by Stephen Day, #3 Waiver of Service by Ben Satterfield, #4 Waiver of Service by Beauty Baldwin, #5 Waiver of Service by Alice O'Lenick)(Sells, Bryan) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: The Plaintiffs must immediately effectuate service of process of the #1 Complaint upon the Defendants. No corresponding motion has been filed for a temporary restraining order, and if the Plaintiffs wish for the Court to consider a temporary restraining order, Plaintiffs must comply with LR 7.1(A)(1). If such a motion is filed, Plaintiffs should give notice to the Defendants of the filing of its motion using the quickest possible means. The Clerk is directed to terminate the submission of a temporary restraining order on the docket, as there has not been a temporary restraining order filed. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/14/2020. (ah) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/14/2020. (ah) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of TRO #1 Complaint to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Gwinnett County Board of Registration and Elections, John Mangano, Stephen Day, Ben Satterfield, Beauty Baldwin, Alice O'Lenick and Brad Raffensperger. (Attachments: #1 Summons Mangano, #2 Summons Day, #3 Summons Satterfield, #4 Summons Baldwin, #5 Summons O'Lenick, #6 Summons Raffensperger)(ah) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc., Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Inc., Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Atlanta, Inc., New Georgia Project and Common Cause. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9588472) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The New Georgia Project is a litigant

Latest cases where Georgia Coalition for the Peoples' Agenda, Inc. is a litigant