This case was last updated from PACER on 08/18/2019 at 07:13:09 (UTC).

Georgeanne Hall v. Hills Pet Nutrition Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 Georgeanne Hall filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Hills Pet Nutrition Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie A. Robinson and Teresa J. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02329

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Georgeanne Hall

Defendants

Hills Pet Nutrition Inc.

Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph J. DePalma

Attorney at Lite DePalma Greenberg, LLC

570 Broad Street, 12Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Susana Cruz Hodge

Attorney at Lite DePalma Greenberg, LLC

570 Broad Street, 12Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Rebecca A. Peterson

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen, PLLP

100 Washington Avenue S, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401-2179

Conrad B. Stephens

Attorney at Stephens and Stephens LLP

505 South Mcclelland Street

Santa Maria, CA 93454

Kevin A. Seely

Attorney at Robbins Arroyo, LLP

5040 Shoreham Place

San Diego, CA 92122

Charles J. LaDuca

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert and LaDuca LLP

4725 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Katherine W. Van Dyck

Attorney at Cuneo Gilbert and LaDuca LLP

4725 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Steven M. McKany

Attorney at Robbins Arroyo, LLP

5040 Shoreham Place

San Diego, CA 92122

Robert K. Shelquist

Attorney at Lockridge Grindal Nauen, PLLP

100 Washington Avenue S, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55401-2179

Darnell R. Donahue

Attorney at Robbins Arroyo, LLP

5040 Shoreham Place

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. Goetz

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP - LA

400 South Hope Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Amy J. Laurendeau

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP - Newport Beach

610 Newport Center Drive, Suite 1700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Hannah Y. Chanoine

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP - NY

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert K Shelquist. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Charles J LaDuca. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Katherine Van Dyck. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J Depalma. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#57

(#57) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Darnell R. Donahue on behalf of Georgeanne Hall (Donahue, Darnell) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

56 #2

Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines

56 #1

Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order

#56

(#56) LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#55

(#55) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-01423. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

55 #1

*Restricted*

#54

(#54) Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2887, transferring case to USDC, District of Kansas and assigned to Honorable Robinson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 06/18/2019)

41 #3

Proposed Order

41 #2

Declaration of Hannah Y. Chanoine in Support

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Darnell R. Donahue on behalf of Georgeanne Hall (Donahue, Darnell) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-01423. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (hw) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-1) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2887, transferring case to USDC, District of Kansas and assigned to Honorable Robinson. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO VACATE ALL DEADLINES PENDING THE JPMLS DECISION #41 **note changes made by Court to this document** (sr) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) Text Entry Order STRIKING Order on Motion to Stay Case, #51 due to clerical error. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) [stricken due to clerical error] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO VACATE ALL DEADLINES PENDING THE JPML'S DECISION #41 by Judge John F. Walter. The Application is GRANTED. The above-captioned action is hereby stayed until after the JPML decides the MDL Motion. The Scheduling Conference set for May 13, 2019 is VACATED, as are all other deadlines. (iv) Modified on 5/8/2019 (sr). [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Hannah Y. Chanoine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc, designating Richard B. Goetz as local counsel #48 . (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10, filed by Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc... (Goetz, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hannah Y. Chanoine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23634569) filed by Defendants Hills Pet Nutrition Sales, Inc., Hills Pet Nutrition, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goetz, Richard) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Susana Cruz Hodge. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph J Depalma. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Katherine Van Dyck. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Charles J LaDuca. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Robert K Shelquist. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23277657 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Georgeanne Hall. (Attorney Rebecca Anne Peterson added to party Georgeanne Hall(pty:pla))(Peterson, Rebecca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/19/2019.] (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.