This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2022 at 07:53:01 (UTC).

George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund, LLC v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Victor Marrero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09171

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victor Marrero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund, LLC

New York City Regional Center, LLC

Defendant

The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey S. Geier

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Patrick George Rideout

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) DUPLICATE ORIGINAL AMENDED STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court as related to Bankruptcy Court Case No. 19-13196. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(a) any or all cases under title 11 and any or all proceedings arising under title 11 or arising in or related to a case under title 11 are referred to the bankruptcy judges for this district. (See 1:12-mc-00032 (M-10-468) Order Filed February 1, 2012) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (gp) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey S. Geier served on GEORGE WASHINGTON BRIDGE BUS STATION AND INFRASTRUCTURE DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC and NEW YORK CITY REGIONAL CENTER, LLC on November 5, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Rideout, Patrick) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Geier on behalf of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Geier, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

3 #8

Exhibit 8 - Sale Order

3 #7

Exhibit 7 - Stalking Horse Order

3 #6

Exhibit 6 - Revised Order Approving the Settlement

3 #5

Exhibit 5 - Settlement Agreement

3 #4

Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service

3 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - Complaint

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - Standing Order

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rideout, Patrick) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Sale Order

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Revised Order Approving the Settlement

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York..(gp) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketUSBC Case Number: 21-1200 (DSJ)..(gp) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DUPLICATE ORIGINAL AMENDED STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court as related to Bankruptcy Court Case No. 19-13196. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(a) any or all cases under title 11 and any or all proceedings arising under title 11 or arising in or related to a case under title 11 are referred to the bankruptcy judges for this district. (See 1:12-mc-00032 (M-10-468) Order Filed February 1, 2012) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (gp) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey S. Geier served on GEORGE WASHINGTON BRIDGE BUS STATION AND INFRASTRUCTURE DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC and NEW YORK CITY REGIONAL CENTER, LLC on November 5, 2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Rideout, Patrick) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Geier on behalf of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey..(Geier, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 655790/2021..Document filed by The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Standing Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Revised Order Approving the Settlement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Stalking Horse Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - Sale Order).(Rideout, Patrick) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rideout, Patrick) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 655790/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25296045).Document filed by George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Standing Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit 5 - Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Revised Order Approving the Settlement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Stalking Horse Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - Sale Order).(Rideout, Patrick) Modified on 11/5/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York City Regional Center, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Port Authority of New York and New Jersey is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick George Rideout