This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:26:24 (UTC).

George v. The Kroger Co.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 George filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Kroger Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden and Michael P. Mills. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00189

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Mills

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda George

Defendant

The Kroger Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ben Thomas Woodhouse

Attorney at BAILEY, WOMBLE AND YELTON

P.O. Drawer 1615, 357 Highway 51

Batesville, MS 38606

Thomas A. Womble

Attorney at BAILEY & WOMBLE

P.O. Box 1615

Batesville, MS 38606

Defendant Attorney

William O. Luckett, Jr.

Attorney at LUCKETT TYNER LAW FIRM

P. O. Drawer 1000

Clarksdale, MS 38614-1000

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brenda George by William O. Luckett, Jr on behalf of The Kroger Co. (Luckett, William)

#13

(#13) ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/11/19. (irw)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 9:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3 days) (spw)

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 5/21/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/29/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 2/20/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 3/20/2020. Motions due by 6/15/2020. Settlement Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/9/19. (irw)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)

#8

(#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 10/7/2019. (irw)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by William O. Luckett, Jr on behalf of The Kroger Co.. (Luckett, William)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Thomas A. Womble on behalf of Brenda George to Defendant. (Womble, Thomas)

5 #2

State Court Complaint State Court Complaint

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint) (Luckett, William)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/9/19. (irw)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by The Kroger Co.. (Luckett, William)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Brenda George, filed by The Kroger Co. (tab) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 State Court Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brenda George by William O. Luckett, Jr on behalf of The Kroger Co. (Luckett, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/11/19. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 9:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3 days) (spw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 5/21/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/29/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 2/20/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 3/20/2020. Motions due by 6/15/2020. Settlement Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/9/19. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 10/7/2019. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by William O. Luckett, Jr on behalf of The Kroger Co.. (Luckett, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Thomas A. Womble on behalf of Brenda George to Defendant. (Womble, Thomas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint) (Luckett, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/9/19. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by The Kroger Co.. (Luckett, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Brenda George, filed by The Kroger Co. (tab) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co. from Circuit Court of Panola County, Second Judicial District, case number CV2019-211SMP2. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1712718) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 State Court Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less