This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2022 at 07:16:13 (UTC).

Adam George v. Airbnb, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Adam George filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Airbnb, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01065

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam George

Defendants

Airbnb, Inc.

DOES 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelsey Marie Schultz

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A. Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M. Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32803945 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Adam George. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Adam George(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adam George. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adam George, identifying AIRBNB, INC.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Adam George. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Adam George. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Airbnb, Inc.. (car) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Adam George, upon Defendant Airbnb, Inc. served on 2/21/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gares\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Adam George. (Schultz, Kelsey) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Having been advised by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled #12 , IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. The court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

14 #14

Main Document

14 #1

Order

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Adam George. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Adam George. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Order) (iv) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Having been advised by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled #12 , IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. The court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Adam George. (Schultz, Kelsey) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Adam George, upon Defendant Airbnb, Inc. served on 2/21/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gares\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Airbnb, Inc.. (car) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Adam George. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Adam George. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adam George, identifying AIRBNB, INC.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adam George. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32803945 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Adam George. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Adam George(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIRBNB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelsey Marie Schultz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A Burroughs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M Doniger