This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2021 at 09:09:11 (UTC).

George Steinmetz v. Adobe Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 George Steinmetz filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Adobe Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Charles F. Eick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06825

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGE STEINMETZ

Defendants

ADOBE INC.

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A. Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Frank Trechsel

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff George Steinmetz, upon Defendant Adobe Inc. served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Lynanne Gares\Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-06825 DMG(Ex). (rn) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Adobe Inc.. (car) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by GEORGE STEINMETZ. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GEORGE STEINMETZ, (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GEORGE STEINMETZ. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff GEORGE STEINMETZ. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31865047 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff GEORGE STEINMETZ. (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party GEORGE STEINMETZ(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADOBE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank Trechsel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A Burroughs