This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 07:11:37 (UTC).

George E. Jacobs IV v. B Presnell et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 George E Jacobs IV filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against B Presnell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07638

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

George E. Jacobs, IV

Imperial, CA 92251

Defendants

B. Presnell

R. Johnson

D. Ulstad

CSR

C&PR

PMU

CSU

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

(#5) STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff George E. Jacobs, IV. (efc) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Dismissal filed by plaintiff George E. Jacobs, IV. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.)(es) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Dismissal filed by plaintiff George E. Jacobs, IV. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.)(es) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT filed by Plaintiff George E. Jacobs, IV. (efc) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INMATE STATEMENT REPORT re: REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California State Prison, Los Angeles County (LAC) in Lancaster is DI #2 .(es) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California State Prison, Los Angeles County (LAC) in Lancaster is DIRECTED to submit a certified Prison Trust Account Statement for George E Jacobs IV CDC J48666 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account Statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified Prison Trust Account Statement in pdf format to PrisonerFilings_CACD@cacd.uscourts.gov with the case number and inmate name in the subject line as reflected on this notification. filed by plaintiff George E. Jacobs, IV. (esa) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants C&PR(Classification and Parole Representative, in individual capacity), C&PR(Classification and Parole Representative, in official capacity), CSR(Classification Staff Representative, in official capacity), CSR(Classification Staff Representative, in individual capacity), CSU(Classification Services Unit, in individual capacity), CSU(Classification Services Unit, in official capacity), R. Johnson, PMU(Population Management Unit, in individual capacity), PMU(Population Management Unit, in official capacity), B. Presnell, D. Ulstad pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J Standish, filed by plaintiff George E. Jacobs, IV. (esa) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSR LIMITED is a litigant