This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2021 at 09:25:58 (UTC).

Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. GPM Investments, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Geographic Location Innovations LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GPM Investments, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00908

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geographic Location Innovations LLC

Defendant

GPM Investments, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

D. Bradley Kizzia

Attorney at Kizzia & Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

Jay B. Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. GPM Investments, LLC served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Geographic Location Innovations LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#8

(#8) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Geographic Location Innovations LLC (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. GPM Investments, LLC served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to GPM Investments, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15177431), filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Geographic Location Innovations LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D Bradley Kizzia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Brett Johnson