Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2021 at 14:17:23 (UTC).

Geographic Location Innovations, LLC v. Evereve Incorporated

Case Summary

On April 23, 2021, Geographic Location Innovations LLC (“Plaintiff” or “GLI”), represented by Paul J. Robbennolt of Padmanabhan & Dawson, P.L.L.C., filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Evereve Incorporated (“Defendant” or “Evereve”), seeking injunctive and monetary relief among other reliefs, for allegedly infringing the United States Patent No. 7,917,285 (“the ‘285 Patent”) entitled “Device, System and Method for Remotely Entering, Storing and Sharing Addresses for a Positional Information Device,” owned by Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding.

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “Upon information and belief, Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe one or more claims, including at least Claim 13, of the ‘285 Patent by making, using (at least by having its employees, or someone under Defendant's control, test the System), importing, selling, and/or offering for sale a website with associated hardware and software embodied, for example, in its store locator system (the “System”) covered by at least Claim 13 of the ‘285 Patent. TheSystem is used, for example, in connection with Defendant’s website at https://evereve.com/stores.”

The Plaintiff further alleged that “The System includes the mobile website and associated hardware. These tools provide a route planner mobile application. This application provides for remote entry of location information, such as destination into a positional information device such as, for example, a computer or smartphone in which users can find stores. The website automatically loads available routes onto the positional information device based on the user’s location.”

The Plaintiff also alleged that “The System includes one or more servers that receive a request for an address such as destination (i.e., an address of a location not stored within the positional device, such as a smartphone). The server determines the address of the destination (i.e., address of the at least one location) and transmits the determined address to the positional information device. The user can see (on the positional information device) a visual indication of the destination in a map.”

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of ’285 Patent by the Defendant, wherein, the Plaintiff claimed that,Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe the ‘285 patent either directly or through acts of contributory infringement or inducement in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271.

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order enjoining Defendant, its agents, officers, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons in active concert or participation with Defendant who receive notice of the order from further infringement of United States Patent No. 7,917,285 (or, in the alternative, awarding Plaintiff a running royalty from the time of judgment going forward); and to award Plaintiff damages resulting from Defendant’s infringement in accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 284. The Plaintiff further requested the court to award prejudgment and post-judgment interest and costs and such further relief to which the Court finds Plaintiff entitled under law or equity.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

 

 

 

 



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01048

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Hildy Bowbeer

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Geographic Location Innovations LLC

Geographic Location Innovations, LLC

Defendant

Evereve Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul J Robbennolt

Attorney at Padmanabhan & Dawson, P.L.L.C.

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Devan V Padmanabhan

Attorney at Padmanabhan & Dawson, P.L.L.C.

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jay Brett Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson, PLLC

1910 Pacific Ave., Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorney

Clint Conner

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPORT ON DETERMINATION OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing.) (lmb) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#15

(#15) REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Robbennolt, Paul) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Geographic Location Innovations, LLC (Robbennolt, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Evereve Incorporated answer due 6/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/10/2021. (LNP) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#12

(#12) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Conner, Clint) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (UNOPPOSED) filed by Evereve Incorporated. (Conner, Clint) Modified event type on 5/10/2021 (LNP). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Conner on behalf of Evereve Incorporated. (Conner, Clint) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geographic Location Innovations, LLC. Evereve Incorporated served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jay Johnson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8713577 filed by Geographic Location Innovations, LLC. (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Evereve Incorporated. (MMP) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Robbennolt, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A (U.S,. Patent No. 7,917,285)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Evereve Incorporated (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8703157) filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (U.S,. Patent No. 7,917,285), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Robbennolt, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

3 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPORT ON DETERMINATION OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing.) (lmb) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Robbennolt, Paul) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Geographic Location Innovations, LLC (Robbennolt, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Evereve Incorporated answer due 6/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/10/2021. (LNP) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Conner, Clint) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (UNOPPOSED) filed by Evereve Incorporated. (Conner, Clint) Modified event type on 5/10/2021 (LNP). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Conner on behalf of Evereve Incorporated. (Conner, Clint) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geographic Location Innovations, LLC. Evereve Incorporated served on 4/28/2021, answer due 5/19/2021. (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jay Brett Johnson for Geographic Location Innovations, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/30/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jay Johnson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8713577 filed by Geographic Location Innovations, LLC. (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#6) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (LNP) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Evereve Incorporated. (MMP) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd 4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 21-cv-1048 (WMW/HB). (MMP) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Robbennolt, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Evereve Incorporated (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8703157) filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (U.S,. Patent No. 7,917,285), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Robbennolt, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Geographic Location Innovations LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul J Robbennolt