This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2021 at 09:57:32 (UTC).

Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. Delta Galil USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Geographic Location Innovations LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Delta Galil USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02289

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geographic Location Innovations LLC

Defendant

Delta Galil USA, Inc. doing business as Splendid

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jay Brett Johnson

Defendant Attorney

Samuel Wallace Dunwoody, IV

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

#6

5 #1

Complaint

#5

4 #1

Attachments

#4

#3

#2

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint ; Answer due for Delta Galil USA, Inc. by 10/13/2021. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Delta Galil USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunwoody, Samuel) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Delta Galil USA, Inc. served on 7/22/2021, answer due 9/13/2021, filed.(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Delta Galil USA, Inc. 9/13/2021.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Delta Galil USA, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunwoody, Samuel) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Delta Galil USA, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(lgouadi, 4) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Geographic Location Innovations LLC, filed.(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Delta Galil USA, Inc. d/b/a Splendid, filed.(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Delta Galil USA, Inc. d/b/a Splendid (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26749102) filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less