This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:41:06 (UTC).

Genworth Life Insurance Company v. Fogel

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Genworth Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fogel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodolfo A Ruiz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-80011

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Genworth Life Insurance Company

Defendant

Judy Lynn Fogel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Patrick Kairalla

Attorney at Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, P.A.

100 Se Second Street, Suite 4200

Miami, FL 33131-2113

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. Service of process must be perfected by 4/6/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

1 #3

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Judy Lynn Fogel. (amb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Long Term Care Insurance Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND REIMBURSEMENT against Judy Lynn Fogel. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12279028, filed by Genworth Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Long Term Care Insurance Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Kairalla, Jason) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. Service of process must be perfected by 4/6/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Judy Lynn Fogel. (amb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND REIMBURSEMENT against Judy Lynn Fogel. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12279028, filed by Genworth Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Long Term Care Insurance Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Kairalla, Jason) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.