This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 09:19:12 (UTC).

GENTRY v. CHUBB et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 GENTRY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CHUBB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-13744

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELA K. GENTRY

Defendants

CHUBB

CHUBB LIMITED

CHUBB GROUP

CHUBB NORTH AMERICA

CHUBB AEROSPACE CLAIMS

ACE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SHANNON & LUCHS INSURANCE AGENCY

AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC.

CAVE HOLDINGS-FLYING W, LLC

FLYING W ENTERPRISES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOUIS GIANSANTE

Attorney at GIANSANTE & ASSOC., LLC

23 E. Main Street

Moorestown, NJ 08057

MICHAEL STANLEY MISKA

Attorney at THE WOLK LAW FIRM

1710-12 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

TIMOTHY MICHAEL JABBOUR

Attorney at Tressler LLP

163 Madison Avenue, Suite 404

Morristown, NJ 07960

DANIEL WESLEY MEEHAN

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

18 Columbia Turnpike, Ste 220

Florham Park, NJ 07932

RONALD A. GILLER

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

18 Columbia Turnpike, Suite 220

Florham Park, NJ 07932

JAY WEINTRAUB

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

77 Water Street, Suite 2100

New York, NY 10005

TREVOR J. COONEY

Attorney at ARCHER & GREINER, PC

One Centennial Square, Po Box 3000

Haddonfield, NJ 08033-0968

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ANGELA K. GENTRY re #16 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Her Motion to Remand (MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

16 #10

Certificate of Service

16 #9

Exhibit G

16 #8

Exhibit F

16 #7

Exhibit E

16 #6

Exhibit D

16 #5

Exhibit C

16 #2

Certification

16 #1

Brief

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC.. (WEINTRAUB, JAY) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure

1 #5

Exhibit State Notice of Notice of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit Process of Service on Chubb

1 #3

Exhibit Index of Pleadings

1 #2

Exhibit Cert. of Service for Aviation Management

1 #1

Exhibit Gentry State Complaint

#1

CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal in DE #1 filed by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC. on 7/16/2021 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (jal, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by ANGELA K. GENTRY re #16 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Reply In Support of Her Motion to Remand (MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff and Defendant ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co.'s ("ACE Property") joint correspondence, dated September 3, 2021, requesting a stay of the motion-to-dismiss briefing and requesting leave for Defendant ACE Property to file a sur-reply in response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (ECF No. #33 .) The Court finds good cause to administratively terminate Defendant ACE Property's Motion to Dismiss pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The Court further grants Defendant ACE Property's request to file a sur-reply within 14 days of Plaintiff's reply in support of her Motion to Remand. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/7/2021. (gxh) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Letter from Counsel Miska & Jabbour re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). (MISKA, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC. re #16 MOTION to Remand (WEINTRAUB, JAY) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC. re #16 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Underlying Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Aviation Removal Notice, #4 Exhibit Chubb Ltd SEC, #5 Exhibit Joint Removal Notice, #6 Exhibit Proposed Order for Opposition to Motion to Remand, #7 Certificate of Service)(WEINTRAUB, JAY) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #30 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). Motion set for 9/20/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) by ACE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 9/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(JABBOUR, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ACE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from New Jersey Superior Court, Somerset County, case number SOM-L-624-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12737079), filed by ACE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(JABBOUR, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Remand . Motion reset for 9/20/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) LETTER ORDER adjourning the #16 MOTION to Remand from 09/07/2021 to 09/20/2021. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 08/17/2021. (jdb) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD A. GILLER on behalf of SHANNON & LUCHS INSURANCE AGENCY (GILLER, RONALD) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by TREVOR J. COONEY on behalf of CAVE HOLDINGS-FLYING W, LLC, FLYING W ENTERPRISES, INC. (COONEY, TREVOR) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support filed by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (WEINTRAUB, JAY) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATION in Support filed by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Underlying Complaint, #3 Exhibit Unreported Decisions, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order)(WEINTRAUB, JAY) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC.. (WEINTRAUB, JAY) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC.. (WEINTRAUB, JAY) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal in DE #1 filed by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC. on 7/16/2021 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (jal, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC. from Superior Court of NJ, Law Division, Somerset County, case number SOM-L-000624-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12637805), filed by AVIATION INSURANCE MANAGERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gentry State Complaint, #2 Exhibit Cert. of Service for Aviation Management, #3 Exhibit Index of Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Process of Service on Chubb, #5 Exhibit State Notice of Notice of Removal, #6 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(WEINTRAUB, JAY) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHUBB NORTH AMERICAN CLAIMS is a litigant

Latest cases where CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where Chubb Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co. is a litigant