This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2022 at 09:14:05 (UTC).

Gentles v. NCB Management Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 Gentles filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against NCB Management Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia Morales Howard and Joel B. Toomey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Gentles

Defendant

NCB Management Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jibrael S. Hindi

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

Suite 1744, 110 S.E. 6Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Thomas John Patti, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Jibrael S. Hindi

110 S.E. 6Th Street, 1700

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Schuette

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Dr. Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33618-4317

Dayle Marie Van Hoose

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Dr Ste 195

Tampa, FL 33618-4317

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2022-CC-001922XXXXMA filed in State Court on 2/21/2022. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19374604 filed by NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against NCB Management Services, Inc. filed by Patrick Gentles. (originally filed in State Court) (RH) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by NCB Management Services, Inc..(Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Schuette on behalf of NCB Management Services, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Michael P. Schuette. (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by NCB Management Services, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Stay by NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. This case is stayed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close the case. Joint status report due May 31, 2022, and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 3/31/2022. (JW) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Patrick Gentles. (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Patrick Gentles. Related case(s): No (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas John Patti, III on behalf of Patrick Gentles. Lead Counsel: Thomas J. Patti, Esq.. (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas John Patti, III on behalf of Patrick Gentles. Lead Counsel: Thomas J. Patti, Esq.. (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Patrick Gentles. Related case(s): No (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Patrick Gentles. (Patti, Thomas) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Joint Motion and Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. This case is stayed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively close the case. Joint status report due May 31, 2022, and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 3/31/2022. (JW) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION to Stay by NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by NCB Management Services, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Schuette on behalf of NCB Management Services, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Michael P. Schuette. (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by NCB Management Services, Inc..(Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against NCB Management Services, Inc. filed by Patrick Gentles. (originally filed in State Court) (RH) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:22-cv-0336-MMH-JBT. (SJB) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Duval County, Florida, case number 16-2022-CC-001922XXXXMA filed in State Court on 2/21/2022. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19374604 filed by NCB Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schuette, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCB Management Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Paul Schuette, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dayle Marie Van Hoose