This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2020 at 14:46:06 (UTC).

Gentili v. Sturbridge

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 Gentili filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sturbridge. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-40062

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fulvio Joseph Gentili

Pompano Beach, FL 33062

F. Joseph Gentili

Pompano Beach, FL 33062

Defendant

Town of Sturbridge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fulvio Joseph Gentili

501 N. Riverside Drive

Pompano Beach, FL 33062

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas P. Lane, Jr.

Attorney at Kopelman & Paige, PC

Suite 700, 31 St. James Avenue

Boston, MA 02116

Jonathan D. Eichman

Attorney at KP Law, P.C.

12Th Floor, 101 Arch Street

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Opposition re #8 MOTION to Strike Five of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Town of Sturbridge. (Lane, Thomas) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

8 #6

Exhibit

8 #5

Exhibit

8 #4

Exhibit

8 #3

Exhibit

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Memorandum of Law

#8

(#8) MOTION to Strike Five of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Fulvio Joseph Gentili. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Gentili, Fulvio) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Town of Sturbridge.(Lane, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Eichman on behalf of Town of Sturbridge (Eichman, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Lane, Jr on behalf of Town of Sturbridge (Lane, Thomas) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Fulvio Joseph Gentili. (Gentili, Fulvio) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Town of Sturbridge. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Violation of 5th Amendment Right to Compensation against Town of Sturbridge Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8263982 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fulvio Joseph Gentili. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Gentili, Fulvio) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #8 Motion to Strike. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Opposition re #8 MOTION to Strike Five of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Town of Sturbridge. (Lane, Thomas) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Strike Five of Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Fulvio Joseph Gentili. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Gentili, Fulvio) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Town of Sturbridge.(Lane, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Eichman on behalf of Town of Sturbridge (Eichman, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Lane, Jr on behalf of Town of Sturbridge (Lane, Thomas) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Fulvio Joseph Gentili. (Gentili, Fulvio) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Town of Sturbridge. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Violation of 5th Amendment Right to Compensation against Town of Sturbridge Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8263982 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Fulvio Joseph Gentili. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Gentili, Fulvio) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Patrick Lane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan D. Reichman