This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:03:51 (UTC).

Genovese v. Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC et ano.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Genovese filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC et ano. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joanna Seybert and A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06882

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joanna Seybert

Referral Judge

A. Kathleen Tomlinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sara Genovese

Defendants

SRA Associates, Inc.

Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC

Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC

SRA Associates, Inc. doing business as SRA Associates of New Jersey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Barshay

Attorney at Barshay Sanders, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Craig B. Sanders

Attorney at Barshay Sanders, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron R Easley

Attorney at Sessions Fishman Nathan & Israel LLC

3 Cross Creek Drive

Flemington, NJ 08822

Arthur Sanders

Attorney at Barron & Newburger, P.C.

30 South Main Street

New City, NY 10956-3515

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Amended Complaint. Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC answer due 2/14/2020; Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC answer due 2/14/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/29/2020. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#17

(#17) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC, Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC. (Sanders, Arthur) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sanders, Arthur) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sanders, Arthur) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Genovese. Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

10 #3

Proposed Summons

10 #2

Proposed Summons

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC, Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC, filed by Sara Genovese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SRA Associates, Inc.. (Easley, Aaron) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for January 28, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/17/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to SRA Associates, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Sara Genovese (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SRA Associates, Inc.. (Easley, Aaron) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #10 Amended Complaint. Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC answer due 2/14/2020; Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC answer due 2/14/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/29/2020. (Ryan, Mary) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Amended Complaint by Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC, Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC. (Sanders, Arthur) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sanders, Arthur) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur Sanders on behalf of Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Sanders, Arthur) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the filing of the Amended Complaint [DE 10], and the fact that the answers are not yet due from the newly added defendants, the Court is adjourning the Initial Conference from January 28, 2020 to March 3, 2020 at 10 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 1/24/2020. (Wolf, Deanna) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Genovese. Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Genovese. Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Summons Issued as to Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC. (Valle, Christine) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stoneleigh Recovery Associates, LLC, Bureaus Investment Group Portfolio No. 15, LLC, filed by Sara Genovese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sara Genovese. SRA Associates, Inc. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SRA Associates, Inc. (Easley, Aaron) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SRA Associates, Inc.. (Easley, Aaron) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for January 28, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 12/17/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to SRA Associates, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketThis attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Sara Genovese (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SRA Associates, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12134560 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Sara Genovese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less