This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:04:09 (UTC).

Genna v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Genna filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06878

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosa Genna

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard D. Olinsky

Attorney at Olinsky Law Group

250 South Clinton St., Ste 210

Syracuse, NY 13202

Defendant Attorney

Paulina Stamatelos

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

271A Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER: Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint 3/23/2020. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by 5/22/2020. Defendant shall file and serve its response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by 7/21/2020. Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply, if any, by 8/11/2020. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/23/2019. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Paulina Stamatelos on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Stamatelos, Paulina) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Defendant shall file the administrative record, which will constitute Defendant's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint 3/23/2020. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for judgment on the pleadings by 5/22/2020. Defendant shall file and serve its response to Plaintiff's motion, which response must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and underlying administrative proceedings, by 7/21/2020. Plaintiff shall file and serve a reply, if any, by 8/11/2020. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/23/2019. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12133631 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Rosa Genna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Letter to Clerk, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons) (Olinsky, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less