This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2021 at 07:19:46 (UTC).

Genius Media Group, Inc. et al v. Alphabet Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Genius Media Group, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Alphabet Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia K. DeMarchi and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-09092

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Virginia K. DeMarchi

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE NATION COMPANY, L.P.

GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC.

THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.

Defendants

Alphabet Inc.,

YouTube, LLC

Google LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hsiao C. Mao

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

44 Montgomery Street, 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

David Boies

Attorney at Boies Schiller and Flexner

333 Main Street

Armonk, NY 10504

Carol L. O'Keefe

Attorney at Korein Tillery

505 No 7Th St., Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63101

Robert E. Litan

Attorney at Korein Tillery LLC

505 N. 7Th Street, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63101-1625

Jamie L Boyer

Attorney at Korein Tillery,LLC

505 N. 7Th Street, Suite 3600

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Stephen Matthew Tillery

Attorney at Korein Tillery, LLC

505 North 7Th Street, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63101

Ryan Z. Cortazar

Attorney at Korein Tillery

205 No. Michigan Ave., Suite 1950

Chicago, IL 60601

Randall P. Ewing, Jr.

Attorney at Korein Tillery

205 No. Michigan Ave., Suite 1950

Chicago, IL 60601

Philip C. Korologos

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jesse Michael Panuccio

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner

1401 New York Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Sean Phillips Rodriguez

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

44 Montgomery Street, 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Michael E Klenov

Attorney at Korein Tillery, LLC

505 N 7Th Street, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63101

Abby Lauren Dennis

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

1401 New York Ave, Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20005

George Andrew Zelcs

Attorney at Korein Tillery LLC

205 N. Michigan Plaza, Suite 1950

Chicago, IL 60601

Sabria Alexandra McElroy

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner, LLP

401 East Las Olas Blvd., Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Jonathon D. Byrer

Attorney at Korein Tillery

205 No. Michigan Ave., Suite 1950

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorney

John Edward Schmidtlein

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP

725 12Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#65

#64

#63

#62

10 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

9 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#9

#8

#7

#6

#43

#42

RESTRICTED

#34

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • Docket(#70) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/04/2021, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (41 in 5:20-cv-08984-BLF) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2021. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/8/2021) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket(#67) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Case Management Conference held on 2/4/2021.Total Time in Court: 52 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Carol L. O'Keefe, Philip C. Korologos via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: John Edward Schmidtlein via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docket(#66) CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 3, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no doc ument associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT PUBLISHER PLAINTIFFS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Statement Regarding Consolidation by Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER GRANTING #62 STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/26/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/25/2021) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Case Management Conference re #61 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, - To be determined. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15344570.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Korologos, Philip) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15344568.) filed by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boies, David) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Phillips Rodriguez (Rodriguez, Sean) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc.,, Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/16/2020) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC. identifying Other Affiliate Andreesen Horowitz, Other Affiliate Detroit Venture Partners, Other Affiliate Everblue Management for GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC.. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/16/2020) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/16/2020) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15330210.). Filed by THE NATION COMPANY, L.P., GENIUS MEDIA GROUP, INC., THE PROGRESSIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/16/2020) Modified on 12/17/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nation is a litigant

Latest cases where Genius Media Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE is a litigant

Latest cases where YOUTUBE is a litigant