Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2020 at 08:06:23 (UTC).

Genesis Insurance Company v. County of Ventura et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 Genesis Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against County of Ventura. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and John W. Holcomb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08899

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Genesis Insurance Company

Defendants

County of Ventura

Craig Coley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A Tartaglio

Attorney at Musick Peeler and Garrett LLP

One Wilshire Building, 624 South Grand Avenue Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3383

Karen L. Toto

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

David A. Tartaglio

Attorney at Musick Peeler and Garrett LLP

One Wilshire Building, 624 South Grand Avenue Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3383

Benjamin C. Eggert

Attorney at Wiley Rein LLP

1776 K Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Exhibit B - Coley Action First Amended Complaint

18 #1

Exhibit A - Genesis Policy

#18

(#18) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Genesis Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Coley Action First Amended Complaint)(Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Karen L Toto APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company, designating David A Tartaglio as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C Eggert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company, designating David A Tartaglio as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/30/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788489) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/30/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788205) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788489) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Benjamin Eggert's VA GSC is attached to Karen L. Toto's phv application. Karen L. Toto GSC from VA is not attached. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788205) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): VA missing. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788489) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788205) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Coley Action First Amended Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Genesis Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28280725 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Genesis Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Coley Action First Amended Complaint) (Attorney David A Tartaglio added to party Genesis Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Genesis Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Coley Action First Amended Complaint)(Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Karen L Toto APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company, designating David A Tartaglio as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C Eggert APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company, designating David A Tartaglio as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/30/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788489) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/30/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788205) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788489) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): Benjamin Eggert's VA GSC is attached to Karen L. Toto's phv application. Karen L. Toto GSC from VA is not attached. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788205) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): VA missing. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen L. Toto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788489) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Benjamin C. Eggert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28788205) filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 10/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10385 JWH(JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08899 JWH(JDEx). Signed by Judge John W. Holcomb (rn) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08899 MWF(JCx). (rn) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Craig Coley, County of Ventura. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Craig Coley) (lh) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons - Craig Coley)(Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company, identifying General Reinsurance Corporation, the corporate parent of Genesis Insurance Company; General Re Corporation, the corporate parent of General Reinsurance Corporation; Berkshire Hathaway, the corporate parent of General Re Corporation. (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28280725 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Genesis Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Genesis Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Coley Action First Amended Complaint) (Attorney David A Tartaglio added to party Genesis Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Tartaglio, David) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENESIS MOTOR AMERICA d/b/a GENESIS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin C. Eggert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A Tartaglio