This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2020 at 08:18:44 (UTC).

GENESIS DIAGNOSTICS v. CORESOURCE

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 GENESIS DIAGNOSTICS filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against CORESOURCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL H. SLOMSKY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL H. SLOMSKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENESIS DIAGNOSTICS

Defendant

CORESOURCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS M. BLEWITT, JR.

Attorney at GENESIS DIAGNOSTICS

900 Town Center Drive, Suite H50

Langhorne, PA 19047

Defendant Attorneys

ELIEZER GRANEK

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

Two Liberty Pl 22Th Fl, 50 S. 16Th St

Philadelphia, PA 19102

NICOLE H. MUNOZ

Attorney at FIGARI & DAVENPORT LLP

901 Main St Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75202

ANDREW G. JUBINSKY

Attorney at FIGARI & DAVENPORT LLP

901 Main St Ste 3400

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY 3/12/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/2/20. 3/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANDREW G. JUBINSKY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/27/20. 3/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NICOLE H. MUNOZ. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/27/20. 3/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Andrew G. Jubinsky ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14139977.) filed by CORESOURCE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GRANEK, ELIEZER) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Nicole H. Munoz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14139835.) filed by CORESOURCE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GRANEK, ELIEZER) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY 2/27/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/12/20. 2/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

4 #4

Exhibit

4 #3

Appendix

4 #2

Certificate of Service

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CORESOURCE.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit)(GRANEK, ELIEZER) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#3

(#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CORESOURCE ANSWER BY 1/30/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 1/22/20. 1/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TRUSTMARK MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY, Corporate Parent TRUSTCO HOLDINGS, INC. for CORESOURCE. by CORESOURCE.(ahf) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #7

Case Management Track Form

1 #6

Designation Form

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CORESOURCE from Bucks County Court of Common Pleas, case number MJ-07108-CV-328-2019. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 209555) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form, #7 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY 3/12/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 3/2/20. 3/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANDREW G. JUBINSKY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/27/20. 3/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NICOLE H. MUNOZ. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/27/20. 3/2/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF FORMS AND E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Andrew G. Jubinsky ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14139977.) filed by CORESOURCE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GRANEK, ELIEZER) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Nicole H. Munoz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14139835.) filed by CORESOURCE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GRANEK, ELIEZER) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS BY 2/27/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 2/12/20. 2/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CORESOURCE.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit)(GRANEK, ELIEZER) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CORESOURCE ANSWER BY 1/30/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 1/22/20. 1/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TRUSTMARK MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY, Corporate Parent TRUSTCO HOLDINGS, INC. for CORESOURCE. by CORESOURCE.(ahf) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CORESOURCE from Bucks County Court of Common Pleas, case number MJ-07108-CV-328-2019. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 209555) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Designation Form, #7 Case Management Track Form)(ahf) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORESOURCE (a wholly owned Subsidiary of Trustmark: is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS M. BLEWITT, JR.