This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2022 at 07:09:43 (UTC).

General Star Indemnity Company v. Boy Scouts of America Delaware BSA, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 General Star Indemnity Company filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Boy Scouts of America Delaware BSA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01240

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Appellant

General Star Indemnity Company

Debtor

Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC

Appellees

Boy Scouts of America

Delaware BSA, LLC

Tort Claimants' Committee

Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice

Future Claimants' Representative

The Zalkin Law Firm, P.C.

Pfau Cochran Vertetis Amala PLLC

Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company

First State Insurance Company

Twin City Fire Insurance Company

Navigators Specialty Insurance Company

American Zurich Insurance Company

American Guarantee Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

Clarendon National Insurance Company

River Thames Insurance Company Limited

Zurich American Insurance Company

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Appellee Attorneys

Mary E. Borja

Kathleen M. Miller

Attorney at Smith, Katzenstein, & Jenkins LLP

1000 West Street, Suite 1501

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ashley L. Criss

Gary P. Seligman

Derek C. Abbott

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Andrew R. Remming

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Paige Noelle Topper

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht and Tunnell

1201 N. Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899-1347

Tori Lynn Remington

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell, LLP

1201 N. Market Street, 16Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

James E. O'Neill, III

Attorney at Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones, LLP

919 North Market Street, Suite 1600, P.O. Box 8705

Wilmington, DE 19899-8705

Rachel B. Mersky

Attorney at Monzack Mersky McLaughlin and Browder, P.A.

1201 North Orange Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801-1155

Robert Steven Brady

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Edwin J. Harron

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kenneth John Enos

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin A. Guerke

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

David M. Klauder

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Thomas E. Patterson

Erin R. Fay

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Gregory Joseph Flasser

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert D. Cecil, Jr.

Attorney at Tybout, Redfearn & Pell

750 Shipyard Drive, Suite 400, P.O. Box 2092

Wilmington, DE 19899-2092

Matthew Gernet Summers

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

919 North Market Street, 11Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801-3034

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Joint Designation of Additional Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC.(Remington, Tori) Modified on 10/7/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric R. Goodman, David J. Molton, Cameron Moxley and Tristan Axelrod - filed by Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice. (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel B. Mersky on behalf of Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Stamatios Stamoulis on behalf of Century Indemnity Company (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica C. Lauria and Glenn M. Kurtz - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Remington, Tori) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley L. Criss - filed by General Star Indemnity Company. (Miller, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #3

Main Document

#22

(#17) ORDER Granting Motion on Stipulation Regarding Appeal From Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

21 #1

Exhibit 1

21 #13

Main Document

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mkr) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

1 #4

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #3

Exhibit A to Order on Appeal

1 #2

Order on Appeal

1 #1

Opinion on Appeal

1 #1

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER Granting Motion on Stipulation Regarding Appeal From Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED Order re Motion on Stipulation Regarding Appeals from Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC (D.I. #3 ), by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC, Delaware BSA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 10/17/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Conference to discuss consolidation structure and an overall briefing schedule held on 10/7/2022. Counsel for Appellants: K. Miller, D. Richards, L. Rizzo, T. Weaver. M. Sawczuk, R. K. Hill, D. Fournier, M. Joyce, C. Brown, B. Sullivan, S. Ennis. Counsel for Appellees: D. Abbott, J. O'Neill, R. Brady, R. Mersky, M. Summers, S. Stamoulis, M. Eckard. The parties are to resubmit the motion with the agreed-to changes in terms of consolidation. The parties are also directed to reach out to Chambers once the answering briefs are filed. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA et al. (lah) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint Designation of Additional Items To Be Included In The Record On Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC.(Remington, Tori) Modified on 10/7/2022 (nms). (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric R. Goodman, David J. Molton, Cameron Moxley and Tristan Axelrod, filed by Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/6/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric R. Goodman, David J. Molton, Cameron Moxley and Tristan Axelrod - filed by Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice. (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel B. Mersky on behalf of Coalition of Abused Scouts for Justice (Mersky, Rachel) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica C. Lauria and Glenn M. Kurtz, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/6/2022. (nms) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Stamatios Stamoulis on behalf of Century Indemnity Company (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jessica C. Lauria and Glenn M. Kurtz - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Remington, Tori) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mary E. Borja - filed by General Star Indemnity Company. (Miller, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ashley L. Criss - filed by General Star Indemnity Company. (Miller, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Docket(#4) ORAL ORDER: A conference to discuss consolidation structure and an overall briefing schedule for the appeal is set for 10/7/2022, at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/30/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The pro hac motion filed at D.I. 4 on 9/28/2022, has been removed from the docket. The filing contained errors in the caption. First, it referenced cases that the filing party is not a member to. Second, incorrect initials were used after the case number. (nms) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-01237-RGA through 1:22-cv-01247-RGA; 1:22-cv-01249-RGA through 1:22-cv-01252-RGA, 1:22-cv-01254-RGA, 1:22-cv-01258-RGA and 1:22-cv-01263-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JOINT Motion for Consolidation and to Approve Stipulation Regarding Appeals from Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization of Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC - filed by Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 9/28/2022 (nms). (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mkr) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers.(mkr) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED.(mkr) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Opinion entered on 7/29/2022 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein and Order entered on 9/08/22 by Judge Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343-LSS. Fee Status Paid.- filed by General Star Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Opinion on Appeal, #2 Order on Appeal, #3 Exhibit A to Order on Appeal, #4 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(mkr) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less