This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2021 at 08:42:31 (UTC).

General Star Indemnity Company v. Jagsre LLC

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 General Star Indemnity Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Jagsre LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C. Nye and Sam E Haddon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00366

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David C. Nye

Sam E Haddon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

General Star Indemnity Company

Defendant

Jagsre LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordon E. Harriman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard Smith, LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Michael Edward Kelly

Attorney at Kelly Law, PLLC

137 E. 50Th Street

Garden City, ID 83714

Rebecca R. Weinreich

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

633 West 5Th Street, Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shannon Marie Graham

Attorney at Kelly Law, PLLC

P.O. Box 856

380 E. Parkcenter Blvd., SU 200

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #6

Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

1 #7

Summons Summons

#2

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Jagsre LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

#5

(#5) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jordan E. Harriman. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2272700.)Michael Edward Kelly appearing for Plaintiff General Star Indemnity Company. Responses due by 10/6/2021 (Kelly, Michael)

#6

(#6) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Rebecca R. Weinreich. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2272701.)Michael Edward Kelly appearing for Plaintiff General Star Indemnity Company. Responses due by 10/6/2021 (Kelly, Michael)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by General Star Indemnity Company (Kelly, Michael)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by General Star Indemnity Company (Kelly, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change. This case has been reassigned to Judge Haddon. Please use case number 3:21-cv-366-SEH on all future pleadings. (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Sam E Haddon from the District of Montana. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #5 and #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Jordon E. Harriman and Rebecca R. Weinreich for General Star Indemnity Company Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Rebecca R. Weinreich. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2272701.)Michael Edward Kelly appearing for Plaintiff General Star Indemnity Company. Responses due by 10/6/2021 (Kelly, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Jordan E. Harriman. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2272700.)Michael Edward Kelly appearing for Plaintiff General Star Indemnity Company. Responses due by 10/6/2021 (Kelly, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jagsre LLC. (Print attached Summons for service.) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Central Division and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 3:21-cv-00366-DCN for all future filings. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Star Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent GenRe Corporation for General Star Indemnity Company. (Kelly, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against General Star Indemnity Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2270445.), filed by General Star Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons)(Kelly, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordon Edward Harriman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon Marie Graham