This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/22/2022 at 07:33:59 (UTC).

General Star Indemnity Co et al v. LB Commercial Roofing LLC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 General Star Indemnity Co filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LB Commercial Roofing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terence Kern and Christine D Little. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00129

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terence Kern

Referral Judge

Christine D Little

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

General Star Indemnity Co

Thompson Heath and Bond Ltd

First Speciality Ins Corp

Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0510 KLN

Defendant

LB Commercial Roofing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John R Woodard, III

Attorney at Coffey Senger & McDaniel PLLC

4725 E 91 St Ste 100

Tulsa, OK 74137

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Derrick Teague

Attorney at Jennings Teague PC

204 N Robinson Ste 1000

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-6801

MaryAnn Teresa Grover

Attorney at Jennings Teague

204 N. Robinson Ave., Suite 1000

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 11/1/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/7/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 4/17/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (clb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#16

(#16) JOINT STATUS REPORT by First Speciality Ins Corp, General Star Indemnity Co, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0510 KLN (Woodard, John) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/26/2022) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Swiss Reinsurance Company, Ltd. for First Speciality Ins Corp) by First Speciality Ins Corp (Woodard, John) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Ltd., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Underwriting Limited for Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0510 KLN) by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0510 KLN (Woodard, John) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent General Reinsurance Corporation, Corporate Parent General Re Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for General Star Indemnity Co) by General Star Indemnity Co (Woodard, John) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER by Judge Terence Kern granting the substitution of plaintiff Thompson Heath & Bond Limited with proper party plaintiff. All future pleadings shall reflect this substitution. ; granting #10 Motion to Substitute Party (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#10

(#10) Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Thompson Heath & Bond Limited by First Speciality Ins Corp, General Star Indemnity Co, Thompson Heath and Bond Ltd (Woodard, John) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit A - Request for Admission PHV

#8

(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Nick Protentis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2584996) by First Speciality Ins Corp, General Star Indemnity Co, Thompson Heath and Bond Ltd (With attachments) (Woodard, John) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by LB Commercial Roofing LLC (Teague, Justin) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by MaryAnn Teresa Grover on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney MaryAnn Teresa Grover added to party LB Commercial Roofing LLC(pty:dft).] (Grover, MaryAnn) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin Derrick Teague on behalf of All Defendants (Teague, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LB Commercial Roofing LLC (Teague, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

2 #6

Exhibit First Summons

2 #3

Exhibit Def's Corporate Entity Details of Texas Secretary of State

2 #1

Exhibit Docket Report

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2022-449 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2582836) by LB Commercial Roofing LLC (With attachments) (Teague, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 11/1/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/7/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 4/17/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (clb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JOINT STATUS REPORT by First Speciality Ins Corp, General Star Indemnity Co, Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0510 KLN (Woodard, John) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/26/2022) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Swiss Reinsurance Company, Ltd. for First Speciality Ins Corp) by First Speciality Ins Corp (Woodard, John) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Kiln Syndicates Ltd., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Underwriting Limited for Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0510 KLN) by Lloyds Underwriter Syndicate No. 0510 KLN (Woodard, John) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent General Reinsurance Corporation, Corporate Parent General Re Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for General Star Indemnity Co) by General Star Indemnity Co (Woodard, John) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by Judge Terence Kern granting the substitution of plaintiff Thompson Heath & Bond Limited with proper party plaintiff. All future pleadings shall reflect this substitution. ; granting #10 Motion to Substitute Party (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Thompson Heath & Bond Limited by First Speciality Ins Corp, General Star Indemnity Co, Thompson Heath and Bond Ltd (Woodard, John) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Nick Protentis is admitted pro hac vice for plaintiffs. ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Nick Protentis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2584996) by First Speciality Ins Corp, General Star Indemnity Co, Thompson Heath and Bond Ltd (With attachments) (Woodard, John) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing General Star Indemnity Co, Thompson Heath and Bond Ltd, First Specialty Ins Corp, and LB Commercial Roofing LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by LB Commercial Roofing LLC (Teague, Justin) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by MaryAnn Teresa Grover on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney MaryAnn Teresa Grover added to party LB Commercial Roofing LLC(pty:dft).] (Grover, MaryAnn) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin Derrick Teague on behalf of All Defendants (Teague, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LB Commercial Roofing LLC (Teague, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2022-449 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2582836) by LB Commercial Roofing LLC (With attachments) (Teague, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by LB Commercial Roofing LLC (Teague, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against LB Commercial Roofing LLC by General Star Indemnity Co, Thompson Heath and Bond Ltd, First Speciality Ins Corp (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Derrick Teague