This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2019 at 08:21:14 (UTC).

GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY et al v. AA NATURE, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against AA NATURE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David S. Cercone and Arthur J. Schwab. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00937

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David S. Cercone

Arthur J. Schwab

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GNC HOLDINGS, INC.

GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY

Defendants

AA NATURE, INC.

JOHN DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark C. Zheng

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease LLP

500 Grant Street, Suite 4900

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Order Approving Voluntary Dismissal

16 #1

Order on Default Judgment

#16

(#16) NOTIFICATION of Decision sent to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks re 15 Order, Terminate Civil Case, #13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Order on Default Judgment, #2 Order Approving Voluntary Dismissal) (mao) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to John Doe Defendants by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunctive Relief against Defendant AA Nature Inc. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/6/19. (lck) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#12

(#12) BRIEF in Support re #11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC.. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Default Judgment against AA NATURE, INC. by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#10

(#10) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AA NATURE, INC. (mao) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

9 #1

Affidavit for Entry of Default

#9

(#9) REQUEST by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC. for entry of DEFAULT against AA NATURE, INC. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC.. AA NATURE, INC. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/6/19. (ms) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/2/19. (njt) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC.. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

3 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (nll) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTIFICATION of Decision sent to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks re 15 Order, Terminate Civil Case, #13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Order on Default Judgment, #2 Order Approving Voluntary Dismissal) (mao) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) TEXT ORDER APPROVING #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY and GNC HOLDINGS, INC. Plaintiffs General Nutrition Investment Company and GNC Holdings, Inc. hereby dismiss the above-captioned case without prejudice as to Defendants John Does 1-100, Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/6/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to John Doe Defendants by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment and Permanent Injunctive Relief against Defendant AA Nature Inc. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/6/19. (lck) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) BRIEF in Support re #11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC.. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Default Judgment against AA NATURE, INC. by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AA NATURE, INC. (mao) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REQUEST by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC. for entry of DEFAULT against AA NATURE, INC. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default) (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC.. AA NATURE, INC. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/6/19. (ms) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Judge Arthur J. Schwab presiding. (ma) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/2/19. (njt) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC.. (Zheng, Mark) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (nll) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to AA NATURE, INC. (nll) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AA NATURE, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5231452), filed by GENERAL NUTRITION INVESTMENT COMPANY, GNC HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (nll) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GNC HOLDINGS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark C. Zheng