This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2020 at 10:32:07 (UTC).

GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION v. PET SMART, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PET SMART, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nora Barry Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00935

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nora Barry Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION

Defendant

PET SMART, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter J. Ennis

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One Oxford Centre, 301 Grant Street, 41St Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Katie R. Jacobs

Attorney at Dentons Cohen & Grigsby P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-3152

Fridrikh V. Shrayber

Attorney at Dentons Cohen & Grigsby P.C.

625 Liberty Ave, 5Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-3152

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to PET SMART, INC. (elt) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

10 #1

Summons

#10

(#10) PRAECIPE to Reissue Summons by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Jacobs, Katie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Fridrikh V. Shrayber on behalf of GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Shrayber, Fridrikh) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ennis, Peter) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Katie R. Jacobs on behalf of GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Jacobs, Katie) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/6/20. (cjo) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement identifying GNC Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Ennis, Peter) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to PET SMART, INC. (elt) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PET SMART, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5708010), filed by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to PET SMART, INC. (elt) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRAECIPE to Reissue Summons by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Jacobs, Katie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter J. Ennis terminated as counsel for GNC. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/10/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Fridrikh V. Shrayber on behalf of GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Shrayber, Fridrikh) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ennis, Peter) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Katie R. Jacobs on behalf of GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Jacobs, Katie) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/6/20. (cjo) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement identifying GNC Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Ennis, Peter) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/1/2020. (elt) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to PET SMART, INC. (elt) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PET SMART, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5708010), filed by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION A PENNSYLVANIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter J. Ennis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katie R Jacobs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fridrikh V Shrayber