Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2020 at 09:36:05 (UTC).

General Motors LLC et al v. Iacobelli et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2020 General Motors LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Iacobelli. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti and Robert H. Cleland. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-12668

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

Presiding Judge

Robert H. Cleland

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

General Motors LLC

General Motors Company

Defendants

Alphons Iacobelli

Jerome Durden

FCA US LLC

Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey K. Lamb

Attorney at Honigman LLP

2290 First National Building

Detroit, MI 48226

Hariklia Karis

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis (Chicago)

200 E. Randolph Drive, Suite 6000

Chicago, IL 60601

Jeffrey L. Willian

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis (Chicago)

200 E. Randolph Drive, Suite 6000

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Nedelman

Attorney at Nedelman Legal Group PLLC

28580 Orchard Lake Road, Suite 140

Farmington Hills, MI 48334

Judith S. Gracey

Attorney at The Gracey Law Firm

2200 Beechmont Street

Keego Harbor, MI 48320

Matthew J. Porpora

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Jacob Eden Cohen

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Steven L. Holley

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Matthew P. Allen

Attorney at Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone, PLC

840 West Long Lake Road, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098-6358

Thomas W. Cranmer

Attorney at Miller Canfield Paddock and Stone PLC

840 W. Long Lake Road, Suite 200

Troy, MI 48098-6358

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Wayne County Circuit Court. (SSch) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#23

(#23) NOTICE remanding case to WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#22

(#22) OPINION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE to Wayne County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (DPer) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#21

(#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER for an Enlargement of Time for Defendant Iacobelli to response to the First Amended Complaint, ( Response due by 11/27/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#20

(#20) REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION to Remand Reply to Defendant Iacobelli's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand filed by General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. (Karis, Hariklia) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#19

(#19) REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. (Karis, Hariklia) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Remand and FCA's Notice of Removal filed by Alphons Iacobelli. (Nedelman, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#4

(#16) RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Eden Cohen on behalf of FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Cohen, Jacob) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Porpora on behalf of FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Porpora, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit E. Declaration of Shavan M. Giffen, dated September 24, 2020

1 #5

Exhibit D. Docket Sheet, General Motors LLC v. Iacobelli, et al., Case No. 20-01

1 #4

Exhibit C. Amended Complaint, General Motors LLC v. Iacobelli, et al., Case No.

1 #3

Exhibit B. Complaint, General Motors LLC v. Iacobelli, et al., Case No. 20-01199

1 #2

Exhibit A. Complaint, General Motors LLC v. FCA US LLC, Case No. 20012007-CB (Ci

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

(#7) Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, to Amended Complaint by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Wayne County Circuit Court. (SSch) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE remanding case to WAYNE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (DPer) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) OPINION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE to Wayne County Circuit Court. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (DPer) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION AND ORDER for an Enlargement of Time for Defendant Iacobelli to response to the First Amended Complaint, ( Response due by 11/27/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION to Remand Reply to Defendant Iacobelli's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand filed by General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. (Karis, Hariklia) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. (Karis, Hariklia) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Remand and FCA's Notice of Removal filed by Alphons Iacobelli. (Nedelman, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Remand filed by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. identifying Corporate Parent CNH Industrial N.V., Corporate Parent Exor N.V., Corporate Parent Ferrari N.V., Corporate Parent Juventus Football Club for Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Allen on behalf of FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Allen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Nedelman on behalf of Alphons Iacobelli. (Nedelman, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,,, to Amended Complaint by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Holley, Steven) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Willian on behalf of General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. (Willian, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Hariklia Karis on behalf of General Motors Company, General Motors LLC. (Karis, Hariklia) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Lamb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Eden Cohen on behalf of FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Cohen, Jacob) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Porpora on behalf of FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.. (Porpora, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC, Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 20-011998-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8079399 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: E.D. Mich, 19-cv-13429, Judge Paul D. Borman] [Possible companion case(s): E.D. Mich, 19-cv-13429, Judge Paul D. Borman] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A. Complaint, General Motors LLC v. FCA US LLC, Case No. 20012007-CB (Cir. Ct. Mich.), #3 Exhibit B. Complaint, General Motors LLC v. Iacobelli, et al., Case No. 20-011998-CB (Cir. Ct. Mich.), #4 Exhibit C. Amended Complaint, General Motors LLC v. Iacobelli, et al., Case No. 20-011998-CB (Cir. Ct. Mich.), #5 Exhibit D. Docket Sheet, General Motors LLC v. Iacobelli, et al., Case No. 20-011998-CB (Cir. Ct. Mich.), #6 Exhibit E. Declaration of Shavan M. Giffen, dated September 24, 2020) (Holley, Steven) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hariklia Karis