This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2021 at 10:57:49 (UTC).

General Insurance Company of America v. Nunez et al

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 General Insurance Company of America filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nunez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara A. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00150

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Barbara A. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

General Insurance Company of America

Defendants

Rita Irene Nunez

Melchor Tatia

Paul Lopez

Isaac Quiroz

Veronica Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica Bich Anh Do

Attorney at Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley

445 S. Figueroa St., Suite 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Blake J. Russum

Attorney at Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley

1001 Marshall St., Suite 500

Redwood City, CA 94063

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Jessica Bich Anh Do terminated (Do, Jessica) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

5 #4

VDRP

5 #3

Consent Form

5 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

5 #1

Standing Order

#5

(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rita Irene Nunez, Isaac Quiroz, Melchor Tatia* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Blake J. Russum* *Ropers Majeski PC* *1001 Marshall Street, 5th Floor* *Redwood City, CA 94063*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Paul Lopez, Veronica Lopez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Blake J. Russum* *Ropers Majeski PC* *1001 Marshall Street, 5th Floor* *Redwood City, CA 94063*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by General Insurance Company of America. (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants by General Insurance Company of America. Attorney Russum, Blake J. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9402517) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Russum, Blake) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Jessica Bich Anh Do terminated (Do, Jessica) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Rita Irene Nunez, Isaac Quiroz, Melchor Tatia* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Blake J. Russum* *Ropers Majeski PC* *1001 Marshall Street, 5th Floor* *Redwood City, CA 94063*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Paul Lopez, Veronica Lopez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Blake J. Russum* *Ropers Majeski PC* *1001 Marshall Street, 5th Floor* *Redwood City, CA 94063*. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by General Insurance Company of America. (Russum, Blake) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants by General Insurance Company of America. Attorney Russum, Blake J. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9402517) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Russum, Blake) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Insurance Company Of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Blake J Russum