This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2021 at 08:42:46 (UTC).

General Insurance Company of America v. Broan-NuTone LLC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 General Insurance Company of America filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Broan-NuTone LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01342

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

General Insurance Company of America

Defendant

Broan-NuTone LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Thomas Aldrich

Attorney at Law Offices of Lynn M. Yempuku

P.O. Box 7218

London, KY 40742

Defendant Attorneys

Krsto Mijanovic

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel, LLP

500 Capitol Mall, Suite 2150

Sacramento, CA 95814

Sinny Boi Thai

Attorney at Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

555 S. Flower St., 45Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

6 #4

VDRP

6 #3

Consent Form

6 #2

Standing Order re Judicial Emergency

6 #1

Standing Order

6 #6

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Filing Answer in State Court Before Filing

4 #4

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #5

Notice Certification and Notice of Interested Parties

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration In Support of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration In Support of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Declaration Declaration of Sinny B. Thai in Support of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order of Clarification served on John Thomas Aldrich. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Civil New Case Documents, 5 Notice of Noncompliance with Electronic Filing Requirement served on John Thomas Aldrich. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of NONCOMPLIANCE With Electronic Filing Requirement (Local Rule 135(g)): Attorney John Thomas Aldrich is directed to register for CM/ECF. Please visit PACER.gov to register. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Notice of Filing Answer in State Court Before Removal by Broan-NuTone LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, #3 Jury Demand, #2 Notice of Related Case(s). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Filing Answer in State Court Before Filing)(Thai, Sinny) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Broan-NuTone LLC. (Thai, Sinny) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) by Broan-NuTone LLC. (Thai, Sinny) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus Superior Court, case number CV-21-003227 by General Insurance Company of America. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9804516) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sinny B. Thai in Support of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration In Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration In Support of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice Certification and Notice of Interested Parties)(Thai, Sinny) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Insurance Company Of America is a litigant

Latest cases where BROAN NUTONE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krsto Mijanovic