This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2021 at 11:55:02 (UTC).

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY v. BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beryl A. Howell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00345

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beryl A. Howell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

Defendants

NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY

CSX TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stuart Harold Singer

Attorney at BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP

401 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

James P. Denvir

Attorney at Boies Schiller & Flexner

5301 Wisconsin Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20015

Scott E. Gant

Attorney at BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

James Michael Grippando

Attorney at BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER LLP

401 East Las Olas Blvd., Suite 1200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Frank M. Lowrey, IV

Attorney at BONDURANT, MIXSON & ELMORE

1201 West Peachtree St Nw, Suite 3900

Atlanta, GA 30309

Amanda Bradley

Attorney at BONDURANT MIXSON & ELMORE LLP

1201 West Peachtree Street, Ste 3900

Atlanta, GA 30303

Tiana S. Mykkeltvedt

Attorney at BONDURANT, MIXSON & ELMORE

1201 West Peachtree Street, Ste 3900

Atlanta, GA 30303

James Peter Denvir, III

Attorney at BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorneys

Ron Wray

Attorney at GALLIVAN, WHITE & BOYD PA

55 Beattie Place, Suite 1200

Greenville, SC 29601

Matthew M. Collette

Attorney at MASSEY & GAIL LLP

1000 Maine Avenue S.W., Suite 450

Washington, DC 20024

Linda Sue Stein

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Molly Bruder Fox

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY.(Stein, Linda) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Sue Stein on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Stein, Linda) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Bruder Fox on behalf of BNSF RAILWAY COMPANY (Fox, Molly) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(Wray, Ron) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Bradley on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Bradley, Amanda) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Gant on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Gant, Scott) (Entered: 02/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank M. Lowrey, IV on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Lowrey, Frank) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiana S. Mykkeltvedt on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Mykkeltvedt, Tiana) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) WAIVER OF SERVICE. CSX TRANSPORTATION waiver sent on 2/10/2021, answer due 4/11/2021. (Mykkeltvedt, Tiana) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. BNSF Railway Company waiver mailed on 1/27/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Lowrey, Frank) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. Union Pacific Railroad Company waiver mailed on 1/26/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Lowrey, Frank) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The General Electric Company. Norfolk Southern Railway Company waiver mailed on 1/24/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. (Lowrey, Frank) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/22/2021. (tmf) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad Company. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by The General Electric Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10627975) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 2/12/2021.] (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CSX Transportation Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where General Electric International Operations Company, Inc. is a litigant