This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2019 at 07:18:42 (UTC).

General Electric Company et al v. Lighting Science Group Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 General Electric Company filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lighting Science Group Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05365

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC

Current Lighting Solutions, LLC

General Electric Company

Defendant

Lighting Science Group Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Curtis Neger

Hersh H. Mehta

Natalie Ann Bennett

Karon Nicole Fowler

Elizabeth M. Chiaviello

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Wayne Caldwell

Justin Michael Ellis

Matthew Jason Fisher

Benoit Quarmby

Christopher S. Stewart

 

Court Documents

#68

#67

#66

#65

#64

#63

#61

60 #7

Exhibit Ex. G

60 #6

Exhibit Ex. F

1 #9

Ex I

1 #7

Ex G

1 #6

Ex F

1 #5

Ex E

1 #4

Ex D

1 #3

Ex C

1 #2

Ex B

1 #1

Ex A

#1

143 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/2/2019) (gr) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 8/1/2019 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (km) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Lighting Science Group Corporation. Document filed by General Electric Company, Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Mehta, Hersh) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) OPINION AND ORDER.....Plaintiffs June 19, 2019 motion for a preliminary injunction is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/31/2019) (gr) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Peter C. Neger dated July 26, 2019 re: Courtesy Copies. Document filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, General Electric Company.(Neger, Peter) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from H. Mehta dated 7/24/2019 re: Response to Defendant's 7/23/2019 Letter (D.I. 61). Document filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, General Electric Company.(Mehta, Hersh) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docket(#62) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Justin M. Ellis dated 07-23-2019 re: Delaware Action Order and Transcript. Document filed by Lighting Science Group Corporation.(Ellis, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) DECLARATION of H. Mehta in Support re: #39 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G)(Mehta, Hersh) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #39 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, General Electric Company. (Mehta, Hersh) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • Docket(#5) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Docket(#4) SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Peter Curtis Neger to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCUMENTS TO BE SEALED (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/7/2019) (pc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCase Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Lighting Science Group Corporation. (pc) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (pc). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lighting Science Group Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401237036)Document filed by General Electric Company, Current Lighting Solutions, LLC, Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC.(pc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2019: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H, #9 Ex I, #10 Ex J) (pc). (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less