This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/23/2020 at 09:11:20 (UTC).

General Casualty Company of Wisconsin v. RF Construction, Inc. d/b/a Benchmark Construction et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 General Casualty Company of Wisconsin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RF Construction, Inc d/b/a Benchmark Construction. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly L. Teeter and James P. O'Hara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02470

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly L. Teeter

Referral Judge

James P. O'Hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

General Casualty Company of Wisconsin

Defendants

Benchmark Construction, LLC

Anchor Companies, Inc.

RF Construction, Inc. doing business as Benchmark Construction

Timothy Bruce

Eudora, KS 66025

Amine Bruce

Eudora, KS 66025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ann V. Wolf

Attorney at Levy Craig Law Firm, PC - Kansas City

4520 Main Street, Suite 1600

Kansas City, MO 64111

Shane C. Mecham

Attorney at Levy Craig Law Firm, PC - Kansas City

4520 Main Street, Suite 1600

Kansas City, MO 64111

Defendant Attorney

Tom R. Barnes, II

Attorney at Stumbo Hanson, LLP

2887 Sw Macvicar Avenue

Topeka, KS 66611

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 defendants' second motion for extension of time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by November 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/16/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney),, by Defendants Anchor Companies, Inc., Benchmark Construction, LLC, Amine Bruce, Timothy Bruce, RF Construction, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Barnes, Tom) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Tom R. Barnes, II on behalf of All Defendants (Barnes, Tom) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, mailed to Timothy Bruce and Amine Bruce on 10/29/2020 by regular mail. (ca) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 defendants' motion for extension of time. For good cause, defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by November 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/29/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Amine Bruce, Timothy Bruce. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(smc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2020: #2 Envelope) (ca). (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by General Casualty Company of Wisconsin upon RF Construction, Inc. served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by General Casualty Company of Wisconsin upon Amine Bruce served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by General Casualty Company of Wisconsin upon Timothy Bruce served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by General Casualty Company of Wisconsin upon Benchmark Construction, LLC served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by General Casualty Company of Wisconsin upon Anchor Companies, Inc. served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER. On September 25, 2020, the Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction #5 . Plaintiff has responded and adequately identified the citizenship of all parties, which are diverse under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Based on the information provided, the Court finds that Plaintiff has satisfied its burden to show why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 9/29/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE re #5 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff General Casualty Company of Wisconsin(Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff ordered to SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before October 9, 2020, why this case should not be dismissed against Defendants without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 9/25/2020. (jal) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (gw) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (gw) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by General Casualty Company of Wisconsin identifying General Casualty Company of Wisconsin is a wholly owned subsidiary of QBE Regional Companies (N.A.), Inc. Its ultimate corporate parent is QBE Insurance Group Limited. There are no other subsidiaries of General Casualty Company of Wisconsin as corporate parent . (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff General Casualty Company of Wisconsin - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff General Casualty Company of Wisconsin. (Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5268085.), filed by General Casualty Company of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSU Ave Library Phase 3; Bond No. QSU000444, #2 Exhibit B - O.W. Fisher Chevrolet and Murphy Service Station; Bond No. QSU000452, #3 Exhibit C - Kansas State University Waters Hall Fire Sprinkler; Bond No. QSU000443, #4 Exhibit D - Raymore City Hall; Bond No. QSU000459, #5 Exhibit E - Region #2 Renovation and Security; Bond No. QSU000939, #6 Exhibit F - Osawatomie State Hospital Biddle Building Remodel; Bond No. QSU000438, #7 Exhibit G - Indemnity Agreement)(Mecham, Shane) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Benchmark Construction Co., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where General Casualty Co of Wisconsin is a litigant

Latest cases where ANCHOR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shane Mecham