This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2021 at 08:28:47 (UTC).

General Casualty Company of Wisconsin v. Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 General Casualty Company of Wisconsin filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Nebraska Safety Fire Equipment, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cheryl R. Zwart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-05002

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

General Casualty Company of Wisconsin, a Wisconsin corporation

707 17Th Street, Suite 3100

Denver, CO 80202

General Casualty Company of Wisconsin

Defendants

Sunshine Holdings, LLC, a Nebraska limited liability company

Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc., a Nebraska corporation

Rusch's General Contracting, LLC, a Nebraska limited liability company

Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc.

Sunshine Holdings, LLC

Rusch's General Contracting, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas M. Dunford

Attorney at COZEN, O'CONNOR LAW FIRM - COLORADO

707 17Th Street, Suite 3100

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Scott E. Ortiz

Attorney at WILLIAMS, PORTER LAW FIRM

159 North Wolcott, Suite 400, P.O. Box 10700

Casper, WY 82602

Jacob A. Enenbach

Attorney at ENGLES, KETCHAM LAW FIRM

1350 Woodmen Tower, 1700 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Stephen G. Olson, II

Attorney at ENGLES, KETCHAM LAW FIRM

1700 Farnam Street, Suite 1350, Woodmen Tower

Omaha, NE 68102

Nicholas R. Norton

Attorney at JACOBSEN, ORR LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 1060

Kearney, NE 68848-1060

Nicole J. Luhm

Attorney at JACOBSEN, ORR LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 1060

Kearney, NE 68848-1060

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Nicholas R. Norton on behalf of Defendant Rusch's General Contracting, LLC.(Norton, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/27/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to Complaint by Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc. (Ortiz, Scott) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Sunshine Holdings, LLC.(Olson, Stephen) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Rusch's General Contracting, LLC (Norton, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Rusch's General Contracting, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/19/2021. (Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group, Ltd. for General Casualty Company of Wisconsin. by Attorney Thomas M. Dunford on behalf of Plaintiffs General Casualty Company of Wisconsin, QBE Insurance Group, Ltd..(Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to defendants Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc., Rusch's General Contracting, LLC, Sunshine Holdings, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Requested as to Sunshine Holdings, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Requested as to Rusch's General Contracting, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Requested as to Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Thomas M. Dunford on behalf of Plaintiff General Casualty Company of Wisconsin.(Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) Summons Requested as to Sunshine Holdings, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Nicholas R. Norton on behalf of Defendant Rusch's General Contracting, LLC.(Norton, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Scott E. Ortiz on behalf of Defendant Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc..(Ortiz, Scott) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/27/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docket(#19) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Complaint by Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc. (Ortiz, Scott) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Sunshine Holdings, LLC.(Olson, Stephen) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#16) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Rusch's General Contracting, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Rusch's General Contracting, LLC (Norton, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#14) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sunshine Holdings, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Rusch's General Contracting, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/19/2021. (Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group, Ltd. for General Casualty Company of Wisconsin. by Attorney Thomas M. Dunford on behalf of Plaintiffs General Casualty Company of Wisconsin, QBE Insurance Group, Ltd..(Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to defendants Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc., Rusch's General Contracting, LLC, Sunshine Holdings, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Requested as to Sunshine Holdings, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Requested as to Rusch's General Contracting, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Requested as to Nebraska Safety & Fire Equipment, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Attorney Thomas M. Dunford on behalf of Plaintiff General Casualty Company of Wisconsin.(Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff General Casualty Company of Wisconsin. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4351270), by Attorney Thomas M. Dunford on behalf of General Casualty Company of Wisconsin, a Wisconsin corporation (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunford, Thomas) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Casualty Co of Wisconsin is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen G. Olson, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas R. Norton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott E. Ortiz