This case was last updated from PACER on 03/18/2019 at 07:50:02 (UTC).

Genentech, Inc. et al v. Laurus Labs Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 Genentech, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Laurus Labs Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Genentech, Inc.

InterMune, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Laurus Labs Ltd.

Laurus Generics Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Karen Jacobs

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Ryan Hagglund

Mark E. Waddell

Warren K. MacRae

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brian Wm. Higgins

Jonathan W.S. England

Adam V. Orlacchio

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1201 North Market Street, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801-4226

Christopher K. Hu

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures filed by Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd..(Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#13

(#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd.. (Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc. by Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd..(Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Wm. Higgins, Christopher K. Hu, and Jonathan W.S. England - filed by Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd.. (Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#9

SO ORDERED, re #9 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Laurus Generics Inc. answer due 3/7/2019; Laurus Labs Ltd. answer due 3/7/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2019. (nms) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam V. Orlacchio on behalf of Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd. (Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of Mailing, by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/24/2019 (nms). (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by InterMune, Inc., Genentech, Inc.. Laurus Generics Inc. served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark E. Waddell, Warren K. MacRae and Ryan Hagglund of LOEB & LOEB LLP - filed by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Genentech, Inc. for InterMune, Inc.; Other Affiliate Roche Holding Ltd., Other Affiliate Novartis Ltd., Other Affiliate Roche Holdings, Inc. for Genentech, Inc. filed by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,566,729 B1 ;7,635,707 B1 ;7,767,700 B2 ;7,816,383 B1 ;7,910,610 B1. See attachment for additional patent numbers. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 12/5/2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: See attachment.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 4/15/2022. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1-15

#1

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc. by Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd..(Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Ryan Hagglund, Warren K. MacRae, and Mark E. Waddell for Genentech, Inc. and InterMune, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00078-RGA et al.(ddp) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures filed by Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd..(Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd.. (Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc. by Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd..(Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • SO ORDERED, re (11 in 19-cv-78-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-154-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-202-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-130-RGA, 9 in 19-cv-103-RGA, 9 in 19-cv-110-RGA, 9 in 19-cv-123-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-205-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-219-RGA, 10 in 19-cv-178-RGA, 13 in 19-cv-131-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-223-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-142-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-136-RGA, 11 in 19-cv-104-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-190-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-141-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-177-RGA, 13 in 19-cv-132-RGA, 9 in 1:19-cv-00120-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-111-RGA, 8 in 19-cv-195-RGA, 9 in 19-cv-105-RGA, 9 in 1:19-cv-00109-RGA, 7 in 19-cv-203-RGA, 10 in 19-cv-164-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark E. Waddell, Warren K. MacRae and Ryan Hagglund of LOEB & LOEB LLP filed by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00078-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark E. Waddell, Warren K. MacRae and Ryan Hagglund of LOEB & LOEB LLP - filed by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Christopher K. Hu, Brian Higgins, and Jonathan W.S. England for Laurus Generics Inc. and Laurus Labs Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • SO ORDERED, re (10 in 19-cv-78-RGA, 10 in 19-cv-104-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Wm. Higgins, Christopher K. Hu, and Jonathan W.S. England, filed by Laurus Labs Ltd., Laurus Generics Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00078-RGA, 1:19-cv-00104-RGA(nms) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Wm. Higgins, Christopher K. Hu, and Jonathan W.S. England - filed by Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd.. (Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #9 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Laurus Generics Inc. answer due 3/7/2019; Laurus Labs Ltd. answer due 3/7/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2019. (nms) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam V. Orlacchio on behalf of Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd. (Orlacchio, Adam) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DECLARATION of Mailing, by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) Modified on 1/24/2019 (nms). (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00103-RGA through 1:19-cv-00105-RGA and 1:19-cv-00109-RGA through 1:19-cv-00111-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by InterMune, Inc., Genentech, Inc.. Laurus Generics Inc. served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Laurus Generics Inc. on 1/18/2019; Laurus Labs Ltd. on 1/18/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Genentech, Inc. for InterMune, Inc.; Other Affiliate Roche Holding Ltd., Other Affiliate Novartis Ltd., Other Affiliate Roche Holdings, Inc. for Genentech, Inc. filed by Genentech, Inc., InterMune, Inc. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,566,729 B1 ;7,635,707 B1 ;7,767,700 B2 ;7,816,383 B1 ;7,910,610 B1. See attachment for additional patent numbers. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 12/5/2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: See attachment.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 4/15/2022. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed against Laurus Generics Inc., Laurus Labs Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2547094.) - filed by InterMune, Inc., Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-15, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lak) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laurus Labs Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where InterMune, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Genentech, Inc. is a litigant