This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/26/2020 at 08:01:33 (UTC).

Gender and Sexuality Alliance et al v. Spearman

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 Gender and Sexuality Alliance filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Spearman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Norton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00847

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc

Campaign for Southern Equality

Gender and Sexuality Alliance

Defendant

Molly Spearman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin A Hall

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

1221 Main Street, Suite 1600

Columbia, SC 29201

Peter C Renn

Attorney at Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund Inc

4221 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 280

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Clifford J Rosky

Attorney at University of Utah

383 S University Street

Salt Lake City, UT 84112

Julie H Wilensky

Attorney at National Center for Lesbian Rights

870 Market Street, Suite 370

San Francisco, CA 94012

Tara Lynn Borelli

Attorney at Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund Inc

730 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 640

Atlanta, GA 30308

Puneet Cheema

Attorney at Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund Inc

1776 K Street Nw, Eighth Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Meghann Kay Burke

Attorney at Brazil and Burke PA

77 Central Avenue, Suite E

Asheville, NC 28801

Defendant Attorney

Cathy Lynne Hazelwood

Attorney at SC Department of Education

1429 Senate Street, Suite 1015

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#20

18 #2

Exhibit Consent Decree

18 #1

Memo in Support

#18

#17

#16

#15

11 #3

Proposed Order

11 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

11 #1

Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission

#11

10 #3

Proposed Order

10 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission

#10

9 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

9 #1

Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission

#9

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CONSENT DECREE AND JUDGMENT granting #18 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/11/2020.(jbry, ) (Main Document 20 replaced on 3/11/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 3/11/2020 to replace with corrected order(jbry, ). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Consent Decree)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #11 Motion by Peter C. Renn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #10 Motion by Puneet Cheema to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #9 Motion by Tara L. Borelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #8 Motion by Meghann Kay Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #7 Motion by Clifford J. Rosky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #6 Motion by Julie H. Wilensky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/5/2020.(jbry, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter C. Renn ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983666) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Puneet Cheema ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983584) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tara L. Borelli ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983561) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Meghann Kay Burke ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983533) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Clifford J. Rosky ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983505) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie H. Wilensky ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8983465) by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit For Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)No proposed order.(Hall, Kevin) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gender and Sexuality Alliance, Campaign for Southern Equality, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Molly Spearman served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020. (Hall, Kevin) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/27/2020) (jbry, ). Modified on 2/27/2020 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ). (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Molly Spearman. (jbry, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Campaign for Southern Equality, Gender and Sexuality Alliance, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc.(jbry, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Molly Spearman ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8968398.), filed by Gender and Sexuality Alliance, Campaign for Southern Equality, South Carolina Equality Coalition Inc. Service due by 5/26/2020(jbry, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less