This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2021 at 13:11:46 (UTC).

Genao v. Rivera et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Genao filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Rivera. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George B. Daniels and Debra C. Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10563

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

Referral Judge

Debra C. Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabino Genao

New York, NY 10013

Defendants

City Hall

City of New York

Glmaud

Capt. Hypolite

Capt. Rivera

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Erin Teresa Ryan

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Glemaud, Rivera, Hypolite. Document filed by Glmaud, Hypolite, Rivera..(Richardson, Lisa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Teresa Ryan on behalf of City of New York..(Ryan, Erin) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#9

(#9) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Gabino Genao, NYSID: 04570951M B&C No. 1131700734, at Manhattan Detention Center 125 White Street New York, NY 10013, on 1/20/2021 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha) Modified on 1/20/2021 (sha). (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#8

(#8) PRO SE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Prose Plaintiff and counsel for all parties are hereby notified that this case is referred to Magistrate Debra C. Freeman for the purposes of Case Management and Scheduling pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures. If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally. All correspondence to the Court should be addressed to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman and submitted to the Pro Se Intake Unit, located in the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007 telephone (212) 805-0175. Any procedural questions by Pro Se plaintiff should be addressed to the Office of Pro Se Intake Unit at (212) 805-0175. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/19/2021) (ama) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically notify the New York City Department of Correction and the New York City Law Department of this order. The Court requests that Defendants Captain Rivera, Captain Hypolite, Assistant Deputy Warden Glemaud, and the City of New York waive service of summons. Local Civil Rule 33.2 applies to this action. (Waiver of Service due by 2/18/2021.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/19/2021) (jwh) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation): All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/19/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/21/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#3

(#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Gabino Genao..(rdz) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against City Hall, City of New York, City of New York, Glmaud, Hypolite, Rivera. Document filed by Gabino Genao..(rdz) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Gabino Genao..(rdz) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Glemaud, Rivera, Hypolite. Document filed by Glmaud, Hypolite, Rivera..(Richardson, Lisa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Teresa Ryan on behalf of City of New York..(Ryan, Erin) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Gabino Genao, NYSID: 04570951M B&C No. 1131700734, at Manhattan Detention Center 125 White Street New York, NY 10013, on 1/20/2021 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (sha) Modified on 1/20/2021 (sha). (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO SE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Prose Plaintiff and counsel for all parties are hereby notified that this case is referred to Magistrate Debra C. Freeman for the purposes of Case Management and Scheduling pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures. If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally. All correspondence to the Court should be addressed to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman and submitted to the Pro Se Intake Unit, located in the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007 telephone (212) 805-0175. Any procedural questions by Pro Se plaintiff should be addressed to the Office of Pro Se Intake Unit at (212) 805-0175. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/19/2021) (ama) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is directed to electronically notify the New York City Department of Correction and the New York City Law Department of this order. The Court requests that Defendants Captain Rivera, Captain Hypolite, Assistant Deputy Warden Glemaud, and the City of New York waive service of summons. Local Civil Rule 33.2 applies to this action. (Waiver of Service due by 2/18/2021.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/19/2021) (jwh) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation): All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/19/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case to the Superintendent of Manhattan Detention Center at 125 White Street, New York, NY 10013. (kh) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/21/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Gabino Genao..(rdz) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against City Hall, City of New York, City of New York, Glmaud, Hypolite, Rivera. Document filed by Gabino Genao..(rdz) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Gabino Genao..(rdz) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY HALL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Teresa Ryan