This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2021 at 10:05:10 (UTC).

Genao v. Detectives Endowment Association

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Genao filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Detectives Endowment Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alfred V. Covello and Thomas O. Farrish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01833

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred V. Covello

Referral Judge

Thomas O. Farrish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Genao

New York, NY 10027

Defendant

Detectives Endowment Association

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

envelope

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish for a ruling on #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/29/2021.Motion referred to Thomas O. Farrish.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/9/2020.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2021; Discovery due by 6/10/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2021. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antonio Genao. (Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Detectives Endowment Association, filed by Antonio Genao. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Detectives' Endowment Association is a litigant